Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080

New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 2:24-cv-10493
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 6:08 AM EDT
Defendant
CAREMARK RX, LLC
Defendant
UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Defendant
OPTUMRX INC.
Defendant
OPTUMINSIGHT, INC.
Defendant
OPTUM, INC.
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC.
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC.
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC.
Defendant
ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC.
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY, INC.
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Defendant
CAREMARK, LLC
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
Plaintiff
CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA
Represented By
ROBERT KIRTLEY FINNELL
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 4:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. OPTUMINSIGHT, INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 4:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. OPTUMRX INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. OPTUM, INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. CAREMARK, LLC waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. CAREMARK RX, LLC waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. CVS PHARMACY, INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025; EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025; EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025; EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025; EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025; MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/08 3:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 11/19/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. (FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 11/14 12:23 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC, CAREMARK RX, LLC, CAREMARK, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., OPTUM, INC., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., OPTUMRX INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, )
Related: [-]
1 1 239 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/14 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT against CAREMARK PCS HEALTH, LLC, CAREMARK RX, LLC, CAREMARK, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICES, INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., OPTUM, INC., OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., OPTUMRX INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15807233) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CITY OF ROME, GEORGIA.(FINNELL, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 11/14 12:22 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, )
Related: [-]
order Case Management Order Thu 11/14 12:23 PM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (krg, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Thu 11/14 12:24 PM
Member Case Direct File on 11/14/2024, for MDL 3080 INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION. (krg, )
Related: [-]