New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joan M Azrack
Case #: 2:24-cv-07922
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
VVDN Technologies, Inc.
46610 Landing Parkway
Fremont, CA 94538
Represented By
Kieran Robert Lang
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Siobhan A. Mueller
Wilson Elser Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Richard Winston Boone, Jr.
Wilson Elser
contact info
Plaintiff
Reliance Communications LLC
Represented By
Ryan Miller Maloney
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Jarrett M. Behar
Certilman Balin Adler & Hyman, LLP
contact info
Timothy Sini
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Joshua Feldman
Certilman Balin Adler & Hyman LLP
contact info
Jaspreet S. Mayall
Certilman Balin Adler & Hyman, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
27 27 service Summons Issued Fri 05/16 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to VVDN Technologies PVT LTD. (GO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
26 26 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/15 4:29 PM
Proposed Summons. Re24 Amended Complaint by Reliance Communications LLC (Sini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/15 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neil Patrick Diskin on behalf of Reliance Communications LLC (aty to be noticed) (Diskin, Neil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/14 1:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against VVDN Technologies, Inc., VVDN Technologies PVT LTD, filed by Reliance Communications LLC. (Sini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Orders
Monday, April 28, 2025
23 23 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/28 12:42 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/24/2025 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Maloney for Plaintiff; Boone, Lang for Defendant. The Court sets the following discovery deadlines: Deadline for completion of Rule 26(a) initial disclosures - 5/23/25; Completion of Phase I discovery - 6/24/25; Deadline for motions to join new parties or amend pleadings - 7/24/25; First requests for production of documents and interrogatories due by - 8/8/25; All fact discovery to be completed by 12/5/25; Exchange of expert reports - 2/6/26; Expert depositions completed by - 3/6/26; All discovery completed by - 3/24/26; Final date to take first step in dispositive motion practice - 4/24/26. An in-person settlement conference will be held on July 9, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 910 of the Central Islip Courthouse. Parties are to submit their respective settlement positions via ex parte electronic filing no later than July 6, 2025. A motion to file ex parte is not required. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference. (Not Recorded.) (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Miller Maloney on behalf of Reliance Communications LLC (aty to be noticed) (Maloney, Ryan)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/23 3:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by VVDN Technologies, Inc.. (Boone, Richard)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 04/23 12:46 PM
Letter MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Reliance Communications LLC. (Sini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fully Executed Notice of Consent to Change Attorney
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/23 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Sini on behalf of Reliance Communications LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sini, Timothy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 04/23 5:50 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jaspreet S. Mayall; Jarrett M. Behar and Joshua Feldman terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/23/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 04/22 3:15 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Feldman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/10 11:25 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held at 10:30 a.m. on April 24, 2025 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 571-353-2301 with ID# 179933855. The attached Discovery Plan Worksheet is to be completed by counsel and electronically filed with the Court by April 22nd. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/10/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Wed 04/09 5:30 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice14 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. At this stage, Defendant's motion to dismiss is unlikely to succeed given that Plaintiff's claims appear to meet the threshold for stating prima facie claims against the Defendant. The parties shall proceed through discovery before Magistrate Judge Tiscione to further develop the facts in this case, including the facts surrounding the identity of the Defendant's entity and the relationship between "VVDN US" and "VVDN India." Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 4/9/2025. (AJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/13 2:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re14 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Reliance Communications LLC. (Feldman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - VVDN Technologies Website Screenshot,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - VVDN California Filing re: Officers
Friday, February 07, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/07 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran Robert Lang on behalf of VVDN Technologies, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Lang, Kieran)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
14 14 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 02/06 3:12 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference by VVDN Technologies, Inc.. (Lang, Kieran)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 02/06 4:55 PM
ORDER terminating11 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/6/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
13 13 minutes Telephone Conference Fri 01/24 2:13 PM
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 1/24/2025 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Feldman for Plaintiff; Boone, Mueller for Defendant. Parties do not consent to have a Magistrate Judge preside over this case. Accordingly, a District Judge will be assigned and the parties will need to comply with the District Court's Individual Practice Rules with respect to Defendant's anticipated Motion to Dismiss. (Not Recorded.) (LV)
Related: [-]
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Fri 01/24 2:19 PM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (LV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/24 4:16 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 01/23 8:10 AM
ORDER denying12 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The telephone conference will proceed as scheduled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/23/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
12 12 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 01/22 5:54 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference 1.24.25 Pre-Motion Conference by Reliance Communications LLC. (Feldman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 18, 2025
order Scheduling Order Sat 01/18 9:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on January 24, 2025 before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 571-353-2301 with ID# 179933855. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/18/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
11 11 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 01/17 4:39 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference by VVDN Technologies, Inc.. (Lang, Kieran)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/12 10:26 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond is extended to January 17, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/12/2024. (AMZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/11 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Siobhan A. Mueller on behalf of VVDN Technologies, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mueller, Siobhan)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/11 5:13 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by VVDN Technologies, Inc.. (Boone, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/04 3:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reliance Communications LLC. VVDN Technologies, Inc. served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024. (Feldman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 11/20 12:39 PM
Summons Issued as to VVDN Technologies, Inc.. (IL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/19 9:54 AM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Reliance Communications LLC (Feldman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
5 5 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/15 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jaspreet S. Mayall on behalf of Reliance Communications LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Mayall, Jaspreet)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Fri 11/15 8:18 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CG)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 11/15 8:16 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CG)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 11/15 8:17 AM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
2 2 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/14 1:49 PM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Reliance Communications LLC (Feldman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/14 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18493815 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Reliance Communications LLC. (Feldman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Orders
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/14 12:24 PM
***Notice: Re: Civil Cover Sheet. A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
Related: [-]