Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Amos L Mazzant
Case #: 4:24-cv-01011
Nature of Suit160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 4:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Linda L. Addison
Defendant
Globe Life Inc.
Defendant
Mary E. Thigpen
Defendant
Frank M. Svoboda
Defendant
David A. Rodriguez
Defendant
Darren M. Rebelez
Defendant
Thomas P. Kalmbach
Defendant
Steven P. Johnson
Defendant
Robert W. Ingram
Defendant
Larry M. Hutchison
Defendant
M. Shane Henrie
Defendant
James Matthew Darden
Defendant
Gary L. Coleman
Defendant
Alice S. Cho
Defendant
Jane M. Buchan
Defendant
James P. Brannen
Defendant
Mark A. Blinn
Defendant
Cheryl D. Alston
Defendant
Marilyn A. Alexander
Defendant
Charles E. Adair
Plaintiff
Gautam Jadhav
Represented By
Stuart Lee Cochran
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg
contact info


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Friday, January 03, 2025
4 4 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 01/03 2:44 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Related Actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings, trial, and appeal under Master File No. 4:24-cv-00993-ALM (the "Consolidated Derivative Action"). Within sixty (60) days of entry of this Order approving this Joint Motion, the Parties shall submit to the Court a proposal and schedule regarding next steps in the Consolidated Action. Defendants are not required to answer or otherwise respond to the respective complaints filed in the Consolidated Derivative Action until the deadline set forth in the Court's order on the Parties' proposal. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/3/2025. (xl)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 01/03 2:59 PM
Cases consolidated: Lead case, 4:24-cv-00993-ALM. Member case, 4:24-cv-01011-ALM. All Docket Entries Should Be Made to the Lead Case Number. (xl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 12/02 3:36 PM
TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Amos L. Mazzant, effective immediately. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/2/2024. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
2 2 motion Consolidate Cases Appoint Counsel Mon 11/25 12:04 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Consolidate Cases , UNOPPOSED MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Co-Lead & Liaison Counsel by Gautam Jadhav.(Cochran, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Glancy Firm Resume,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Rosen Firm Resume,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
1 1 33 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/14 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10485483.), filed by Gautam Jadhav.(Cochran, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/14 1:19 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (xl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Thu 11/14 1:19 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (xl)
Related: [-]