Oregon District Court
Judge:Stacie F Beckerman
Case #: 3:24-cv-01895
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 1:51 AM PDT
Defendant
City of Beaverton Police Department
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-4
Plaintiff
Richard John Di Bernardo
1885 NW Quimby St., #318
Portland, OR 97209


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
5 5 order Judgment - Terminate Case Thu 03/06 10:05 AM
JUDGMENT: Based on the Court's ORDER OF DISMISSAL, IT IS ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed on 3/5/2025 by Judge Amy M. Baggio. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 3/6/2025.) (gw)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/06 10:03 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. To date, Plaintiff has failed to prosecute his case, comply with the Court's orders, and show good cause for failing to effect service in accordance with Rule 4(m). The Court therefore dismisses this action without prejudice. Signed on 3/5/2025 by Judge Amy M. Baggio. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 3/6/2025.) (gw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
3 3 order Show Cause Wed 02/12 10:18 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff, a self-represented litigant who is not proceeding in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. § 1915, filed this action on November 13, 2024. To date, Plaintiff has failed to file any proof of service. Plaintiff shall show cause in writing by February 26, 2025, why the Court should not dismiss this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure ("Rule") 4(m) for failure to serve the defendants within 90 days after filing the complaint. The Court stays all case management deadlines pending Plaintiff's showing of good cause and warns Plaintiff that if he fails to demonstrate good cause, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. See Sims v. Wegman, 743 F. App'x 897, 897 (9th Cir. 2018) (holding that the district court did not abuse its discretion in dismissing without prejudice the self-represented plaintiff's action for failure to effect service in accordance with Rule 4(m), and noting that the plaintiff received notice, extensions, and failed to show good cause); see also ECF No.2 (addressing service of summonses and case documents that the Clerk issues at the time of filing and Local Rule ("LR") 3-5's requirements); LR 3-5(c) (addressing a plaintiff's "[r]esponsibility to [s]erve" and stating that "[e]xcept as provided by 28 U.S.C. § 1915, the filing party is responsible for serving all documents issued by the clerk at case initiation upon all named parties"). Ordered on February 12, 2025 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to Plaintiff on 2/12/2025.) (gw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Thu 11/14 9:00 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 3/14/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/14/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 4/14/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 11/14/2024.) (dino)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/14 8:58 AM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Receipt No. 109485. Summons issued as to City of Beaverton Police Department. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Richard John Di Bernardo against All Defendants. (dino)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Issued Summons