Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Greg Kays
Case #: 4:24-mc-09007
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, January 13, 2025
4 4 discov Certificate of Service Mon 01/13 4:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re3 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Eric L. Dirks on behalf of Plaintiffs Andujar Miller, Rasoul Nicholson. Related document:3 Order on Motion to Compel.(Dirks, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 01/10 9:36 AM
ORDER granting1 motion to compel. Signed on 1/10/2025 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
2 2 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Thu 11/14 1:32 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re1 MOTION to compel Third Party Subpoena Compliance filed by Eric L. Dirks on behalf of Plaintiffs Andujar Miller, Rasoul Nicholson. Related [+] (Dirks, Eric)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Subpoena,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Leidos Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - MO Secretary of State Search,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Ecco Response to Subpoena,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Email Conferral Chain,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Leidos' Subpoena
1 1 motion Compel Thu 11/14 1:24 PM
MOTION to compel Third Party Subpoena Compliance filed by Eric L. Dirks on behalf of Andujar Miller, Rasoul Nicholson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/2/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dirks, Eric)
Related: [-]