Montana District Court
Judge:Donald W Molloy
Case #: 9:24-cv-00160
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Case in other court:USBC, District of MT (MSO), 9:22-bk-90119-WLH
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 1:43 AM MST
Appellant
Thorco Inc.
151 Amatasia Ln
Kalispell, MT 59901
Represented By
Matthew T. Christensen
Johnson May, PLLC
contact info
Appellee
Neal Bouma
Represented By
Ward E. Taleff
Resolute Law PLLC
contact info
Appellee
Christy Brandon
Represented By
Daniel S. Morgan
Morgan Law Offices
contact info
Appellee
MO Somers, LLC
Represented By
Riley Matthew Wavra
Laird Cowley, PLLC
contact info
Cory R. Laird
Laird Cowley, PLLC
contact info
Appellee
Ruis Glacier, LLC
Represented By
Riley Matthew Wavra
Laird Cowley, PLLC
contact info
Cory R. Laird
Laird Cowley, PLLC
contact info
Appellee
Whitefish Credit Union
Represented By
Nancy Louise Ellingsworth
Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Appellee
Dennis Thornton
151 Amatasia Ln
Kalispell, MT 59901
Interested Party
U.S. Bankruptcy Court District of Montana (IP)

GPO Jan 14 2025
OPINION and ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Appellees' motion to dismiss, (Doc. 3), is GRANTED for want of jurisdiction as to orders one through six of the appeal. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/14/2025. (NOS)
GPO Feb 11 2025
ORDER granting 33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Meagan P. VanderWeele. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/11/2025. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found here. (NOS)
GPO Mar 26 2025
ORDER denying 51 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/26/2025. (APP)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
58 58 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 3:04 PM
NOTICE by Neal Bouma, MO Somers, LLC, Ruis Glacier, LLC, Whitefish Credit Union Appellees' Second Notice of Supplemental Authority (Taleff, Ward)
Related: [-]