Utah District Court
Judge:Ann Marie Mciff Allen
Referred: Dustin B Pead
Case #: 2:24-cv-00856
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 1:54 AM MST
Defendant
First Chair Holdings
Defendant
eReplacementParts.com
Plaintiff
Jennifer Pedersen
Represented By
Mary Anne Davies
Disability Law Center
contact info
Laura K. Henrie
Disability Law Center
contact info
Angel Tirado
Disability Law Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, March 24, 2025
28 28 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Mon 03/24 8:12 AM
ORDER granting 27 Motion for Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 5/23/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 6/27/2025. Expert Discovery due by 3/27/2026. Motions due by 4/24/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/24/2025. (kec)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
27 27 motion Scheduling Order Fri 03/21 10:57 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Pedersen. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Henrie, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Attorney Planning Meeting Report,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
26 26 order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Fri 03/21 10:05 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER striking 25 Motion for Scheduling Order. The parties notified the court that there are incorrect dates in this motion and a new motion will be filed with correct dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 3/21/25. No attached document. (mjw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
25 25 motion Scheduling Order Wed 03/19 5:09 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Pedersen. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Henrie, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Attorney Planning Meeting Report,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 03/07 11:44 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER. On March 6, 2025, Plaintiff Jennifer Pedersen filed a notice of voluntary dismissal with respect to Defendant First Chair Holdings, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21, the Court hereby dismisses Defendant First Chair Holdings, Inc. from this action and finds as moot its 22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen on 3/7/25. No attached document. (sem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Thu 03/06 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of DEFENDANT FIRST CHAIR HOLDINGS, INC. filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Pedersen (Davies, Mary Anne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
22 22 motion Dismiss Thu 02/13 1:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant First Chair Holdings.(Priest, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Membership Interest Assignment,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Articles of Amendment
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 10:08 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by eReplacementParts.com.(Stelter, Judson)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/31 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Judson D. Stelter on behalf of eReplacementParts.com (Stelter, Judson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/30 12:27 PM
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 2 Complaint. The deadline for eReplacementParts.com, LLC to respond to the Complaint is extended by 14 days to February 12, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/30/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/29 10:22 AM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant eReplacementParts.com. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Burton, Ashlee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Respond to Complaint
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
17 17 misc Modification of Docket Tue 01/28 9:41 AM
Modification of Docket re15 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer: Error: Motion drafted by ineligible attorney Related [+]. Correction: Motion stricken per chambers. Active attorney for the defendant may draft a new motion and submit. (mh)
Related: [-] view ECF16
16 16 notice Notice of Ineligible Attorney Tue 01/28 9:00 AM
NOTICE OF INELIGIBLE ATTORNEY -Attorney Judson D. Stelter, for Defendant eReplacementParts.com, has been notified that he is not in active status and can not practice before this court. ECF15 Motion signed by lapsed attorney. (mh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 01/27 5:06 PM
Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant eReplacementParts.com. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Burton, Ashlee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Respond to Complaint
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashlee M Burton on behalf of eReplacementParts.com (Burton, Ashlee)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/24 11:50 AM
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 2 Complaint. Defendant First Chair Holdings to respond to Plaintiff's 2 Complaint will be extended from January 30, 2025 to February 13, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/24/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/23 4:05 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendant First Chair Holdings. Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Priest, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Hagen on behalf of First Chair Holdings (Hagen, Scott)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Priest on behalf of First Chair Holdings (Priest, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/10 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Jennifer Pedersen. Summons as to First Chair Holdings.(Davies, Mary Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons in Civil Case
Thursday, January 09, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/09 3:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Filed by Jennifer Pedersen. Summons as to eReplacementParts.com.(Davies, Mary Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons in Civil Case
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Electronically Tue 01/07 7:52 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to eReplacementParts.com. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Electronically Tue 01/07 7:52 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to First Chair Holdings. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
5 5 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Mon 11/18 1:52 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/18/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 11/15 8:25 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen on 11/15/2024. (pjd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 11/14 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff Jennifer Pedersen. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 12/5/2024. (kec)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint (Atty) Thu 11/14 1:16 PM
COMPLAINT against First Chair Holdings, eReplacementParts.com (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5244138) filed by Jennifer Pedersen. (Davies, Mary Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Thu 11/14 12:33 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to District Judge Ann Marie McIff Allen. Plaintiff Jennifer Pedersen is directed to E-File the Complaint and civil cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 405 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kec)
Related: [-]