Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:24-cv-06116
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 5:40 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
NOWDIAGNOSTICS, INC.
Represented By
Carly Fein
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Zane Muller
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Brian P. Biddinger
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
DAVID MYRE, III
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
MENGHAN LIU
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
KEVIN P.B. JOHNSON
Quinn Emanuel Urquart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
ORASURE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By
Jared B. Briant
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
RANDALL E. KAHNKE
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
THOMAS K. JOHNSON, II
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
THOMAS JOSEPH BARTON
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Terran C. Chambers
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
BRYAN K. WASHBURN
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
JODY BERRY
Represented By
JONATHAN S. KRAUSE
Klehr Harrsion Harvey Branzburg, LLP
contact info
Michael Paul Bannon
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
JOSHUA M. LINK
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
NOWDIAGNOSTICS, INC.
Represented By
Carly Fein
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Zane Muller
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Brian P. Biddinger
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
DAVID MYRE, III
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
MENGHAN LIU
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
KEVIN P.B. JOHNSON
Quinn Emanuel Urquart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Defendant
JANEAN YOUNG
Represented By
Melanie Lynn Fey
contact info
BRUCE L CASTOR, JR.
Van Der Veen, O'Neill, Hartshorn And Levin
contact info
Plaintiff
ORASURE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By
Jared B. Briant
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
RANDALL E. KAHNKE
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
THOMAS K. JOHNSON, II
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
THOMAS JOSEPH BARTON
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Terran C. Chambers
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
BRYAN K. WASHBURN
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
171 171 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 05/16 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Melanie Lynn Fey on behalf of JANEAN YOUNG(Fey, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
170 170 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin McCaffrey on behalf of JANEAN YOUNG (McCaffrey, Kaitlin)
Related: [-]
169 169 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 05/13 1:05 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT YOUNG'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (ECF NO. 166) IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT YOUNG SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN MAY 22, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 5/13/25.5/13/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
168 168 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 05/12 5:16 PM
Defendant Janean Young's ANSWER to162 Amended Complaint by JANEAN YOUNG.(CASTOR, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
167 167 order Stipulation and Order Mon 05/12 11:07 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFT. NOWDX SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 5/22/25. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 5/9/25. 5/12/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]