Calvert v. Allosource
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Cyrus Y Chung |
Referred: | Cyrus Y Chung |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03165 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:2000(e)(2)-(o)(t) - Job Discrimination (Other) |
Case Filed: | Nov 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 3:03 AM MDT |
Defendant
Allosource
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Calvert
8752 South Yosemite Street
Lone Tree, CO 80124 |
Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago |
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
37 | 37
![]() Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Chad Calvert. (dgumb, ) |
|
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
36 | 36
![]() MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is the plaintiff's Pleading Regarding Missing Mail. ECF No.35 . As plaintiff is pro se, the Court liberally construes the pleading as a motion. The Motion, ECF No.35 , is DENIED. The plaintiff is reminded that he shall file his response to the defendant's motion to dismiss on or before May 7, 2025. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/7/2025.(dgumb, ) |
|
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Letter re: Pleading Regarding Missing Mail and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to25 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Chad Calvert. (dgumb, ) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
![]() MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is the Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time or Continuance (the "Motion"). ECF No.32 . For good cause shown, and without awaiting a response from the defendant, see D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d), the Motion is GRANTED. The plaintiff shall file his response to the defendant's motion to dismiss on or before May 7, 2025. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/3/2025.(dgumb, ) |
|
33 | 33
![]() ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Motion to Stay Deadlines Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Respond to attempts to Confer and Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (the "Motion"). ECF No.29 . It is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss, ECF No.29 , is GRANTED. This matter is STAYED pending further order of the Court and the April 17, 2025 Status Conference is VACATED. The defendant shall file a motion asking the Court to set a Scheduling Conference within seven days of the Court's ruling on the defendant's motion to dismiss, ECF No.25 , if any portion of the plaintiff's claims survive the motion to dismiss. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/3/2025.(dgumb, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time Or Continuance by Plaintiff Chad Calvert. (dgumb, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE of Conferral with Plaintiff Regarding ECF 29 by Defendant Allosource (Lapin, Juli) |
|
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is the Defendant's Motion to Stay Deadlines Due to Plaintiff's Failure to Respond to Attempts to Confer and Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (the "Motion"). ECF No.29 . IT IS ORDERED that the scheduling conference set for April 17, 2025 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung shall be converted to a status conference at the same date and time. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the pending Motion. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 3/25/2025. (dgumb, ) |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
29 | 29
![]() MOTION to Stay Upcoming Case Deadlines by Defendant Allosource. (Labor, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This matter is before the Court on the Elections Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction filed on February 24, 2025 and March 17, 2025. [Doc.17 (signed by Plaintiff Chad Calvert); Doc.25 -1 (signed by Defendant AlloSource)]. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Local Rule 72.2, the Parties have consented to the disposition of this action by a United States Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that: (1) This action is hereby REFERRED for final disposition to United States Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 72.2; (2) The Clerk of Court shall REASSIGN this action to Judge Chung; (3) Judge Chung shall conduct all further proceedings in this case, including, without limitation, trial and entry of a final judgment; and (4) The Parties are DIRECTED to use the following case number for all future filings in this case: 24-cv-03165-CYC . By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/18/2025. (dgumb, ) |
|
27 | 27
![]() CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allosource All parties consent.. (Labor, Nicholas) |
|
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
order
Minute Order
Mon 03/17 4:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Defendant filed a Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction as an attachment to its Motion to Dismiss. See [Doc. 25-1]. Defendant is advised that, in order to effectuate the Parties' consent, it must file the Consent Form as a standalone docket entry. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/17/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) |
|
25 | 25
![]() MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Allosource.(Labor, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, March 10, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas F. Labor on behalf of AllosourceAttorney Nicholas F. Labor added to party Allosource(pty:dft) (Labor, Nicholas) |
|
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Juli Elizabeth Lapin on behalf of AllosourceAttorney Juli Elizabeth Lapin added to party Allosource(pty:dft) (Lapin, Juli) |
|
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER: Plaintiff Chad Calvert moves for the appointment of pro bono counsel, arguing that his case is meritorious but too complex for him to handle alone. ECF No.18 . The Motion for Appointment of Counsel, ECF No.18 , is DENIED without prejudice. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 3/7/2025.(dgumb, ) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Calvert. Allosource served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025. (norlin, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 02/26 8:05 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by USPS by Clerk of Court re 19 Memorandum to Chad Calvert at 8752 South Yosemite Street Lone Tree, CO 80124. Text Only Entry. (echa, ) |
|
19 | 19
order
Memorandum
Wed 02/26 7:50 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Chad Calvert. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/26/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Chad Calvert. (amona,) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Chad Calvert, Plaintiff party consents. (amona,) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MINUTE ORDER: The above-captioned case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung pursuant to an Order of Reference entered by District Judge Nina Y. Wang on February 11, 2025. ECF No. 14 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/10/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2025 10:15 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the scheduling conference . Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 2/12/2025. (dgumb, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 11, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/11 2:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by USPS by Clerk of Court re 14 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,,, to Chad Calvert at 8752 South Yosemite Street Lone Tree, CO 80124. Text Only Entry (agryan) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 02/11 1:07 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung for all motions . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the Parties by motion, this Court may direct the Parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/11/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) |
|
13 | 13
![]() CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re9 Amended Complaint (norlin, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (norlin, ) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 10 February 2025. ORDERED that this case shall be DRAWN to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge. (Case randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. All future pleadings shall be designated: 24-cv-03165- NYW.) (cmadr, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 05, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No.7 ), filed on January 31, 2025, is denied without prejudice as premature while this case is in initial review. Plaintiff shall file an amended Employment Discrimination Complaint, as directed in the November 18, 2024 and January 6, 2025 Orders (ECF Nos.5 &6 ), within 30 days, by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 2/4/2025.(angar, ) |
|
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allosource, filed by Chad Calvert.(cmadr, ) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Plaintiff Chad Calvert. (angar, ) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 01/06/2025. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order , an amended Employment Discrimination Complaint, on the court-approved form, that complies with this order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Employment Discrimination Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, some or all of this action may be dismissed. (pklin, ) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 11/18/2024. (jrobe, ) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915 by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 11/15/2024.(jrobe, ) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 11/14 3:14 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. Text Only Entry. (echa, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) by Plaintiff Chad Calvert. (echa, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against Allosource, filed by Chad Calvert. (echa, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |