New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Referred: Gary Stein
Case #: 1:24-cv-08677
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
Life Line Screening Of America Ltd
Plaintiff
Edery Herrera
On Behalf Of Himself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates PLLC 150 East 18th Street Suite PHR
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 order Judgment - Consent Wed 03/26 12:15 PM
CONSENT DECREE: COURT APPROVAL, ADOPTION, AND ENTRY OF THE CONSENT DECREE THE COURT, HAVING CONSIDERED the pleadings, law, underlying facts and having reviewed this proposed Consent Decree, FINDS AS FOLLOWS: This Court has jurisdiction over the Action under 28 U.S.C. § 1331 and 42 U.S.C. The provisions of this Consent Decree shall be binding upon the Parties; This Consent Decree is for settlement purposes only and does not constitute an admission by Defendant of any of the allegations contained in the Complaint or any other pleading in this Action, nor does it constitute any finding of liability against Defendant; The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter for 36 months; and This Consent Decree shall be deemed as adjudicating, once and for all, the merits of each and every claim, matter, and issue that was alleged, or could have been alleged by Plaintiff in the Action based on, or arising out of, or in connection with, the allegations in the Complaint. NOW THEREFORE, the Court approves the Consent Decree and in doing so specifically adopts it and makes it an Order of the Court. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 3/26/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Fri 03/21 4:16 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Peter T. Shapiro dated March 21, 2025 re: Judicial approval of Consent Decree. Document filed by Life Line Screening Of America Ltd..(Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Decree
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 03/19 4:22 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised at ECF No. 13 that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, requests to extend the deadline to reopen are unlikely to be granted. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per the Court's Individual Rule No. 7, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 3/19/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Tue 03/18 2:36 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Peter T. Shapiro dated March 18, 2025 re: Settlement. Document filed by Life Line Screening Of America Ltd..(Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/19 7:37 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to March 18, 2025. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein) (Text Only Order). Life Line Screening Of America Ltd answer due 3/18/2025 (mc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 02/18 4:10 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Dale E. Ho from Peter T. Shapiro dated February 18, 2025. Document filed by Life Line Screening Of America Ltd..(Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/18 3:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Life Line Screening Of America Ltd waiver sent on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. Document filed by Edery Herrera..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Cain on behalf of Life Line Screening Of America Ltd..(Cain, Erin)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/03 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Life Line Screening Of America Ltd..(Shapiro, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 11/15 12:48 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Line Screening Of America Ltd..(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 11/15 12:45 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 11/15 12:46 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 11/15 12:47 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 11/15 12:47 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 11/14 10:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Life Line Screening Of America Ltd, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Edery Herrera..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/14 10:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/14 10:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Edery Herrera..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/14 9:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Life Line Screening Of America Ltd. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30187750)Document filed by Edery Herrera..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]