Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Case #: 1:24-cv-05198
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC Corp.
Defendant
John Doe 1
Defendant
John Doe 2
Defendant
Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Peter Stone
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Aleksandra Mitchell
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Shawn N. Kalfus
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tyrone Wrighton, Jr
Represented By
Matthew Peter Stone
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Aleksandra Mitchell
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Shawn N. Kalfus
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Defendant
XYZ Corp.
Defendant
Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Peter Stone
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Aleksandra Mitchell
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Shawn N. Kalfus
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kim Hoang Lee
Represented By
Chelsea Spampinato
contact info
Stephen Valero
contact info
Nahra Oh
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc.
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Represented By
Matthew Peter Stone
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Aleksandra Mitchell
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Shawn N. Kalfus
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
40 40 discov Certificate of Service Mon 05/05 2:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tyrone Wrighton, Jr.(Mitchell, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
39 39 discov Certificate of Service Wed 04/23 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc., Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Tyrone Wrighton, Jr.(Mitchell, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
38 38 discov Certificate of Service Thu 03/20 11:42 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE For Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to Def. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC by Kim Hoang Lee.(Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
37 37 discov Certificate of Service Thu 03/20 11:26 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE For Plaintiff's Discovery Requests to Defendant Tyrone Wrighton Jr. by Kim Hoang Lee.(Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
36 36 discov Certificate of Service Mon 03/17 5:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery Materials by Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc., Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Tyrone Wrighton, Jr.(Mitchell, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
35 35 discov Certificate of Service Fri 03/07 2:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery Materials by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.(Mitchell, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 02/24 4:33 PM
Submission of30 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. (Plaintiff has no opposition. See doc.32 ) (sap)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
34 34 discov Certificate of Service Fri 02/21 1:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc., Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc., Tyrone Wrighton, Jr, XYZ Corp..(Mitchell, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Leave of Absence Fri 02/21 9:43 AM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 4, 2025, April 3, 2025, April 4, 2025, April 7-11, 2025, May 14 -18, 2025, June 5, 2025, by Nahra Oh. (Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Response to Motion Fri 02/21 9:39 AM
RESPONSE re30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kim Hoang Lee. (Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
31 31 discov Certificate of Service Thu 02/20 1:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Responses to Swift Transportation Co. of Airzona, LLC's First set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Kim Hoang Lee by Kim Hoang Lee.(Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
30 30 motion Dismiss Fri 02/07 3:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc..(Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Brief - Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Brief - Service Docs
29 29 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/07 3:01 PM
ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.(Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
28 28 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/07 2:26 PM
ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint by Tyrone Wrighton, Jr.(Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Affidavit of Service Fri 02/07 10:36 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Amended Complaint, Certificate of Service , as to Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc. c/o National Registered Agents - Registered Agent. (Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Wed 01/29 1:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc., Tyrone Wrighton, Jr, Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc., Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.(Mitchell, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
25 25 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 01/27 12:23 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Red Rock Risk Retention Group, Inc. (ane)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 25, 2025
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Sat 01/25 5:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona's Discovery Requests by Kim Hoang Lee.(Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/24 11:36 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT With Summons against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Kim Hoang Lee.(Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons for Red Rock Retention Group, Inc.
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
22 22 discov Certificate of Service Wed 01/08 4:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc., Tyrone Wrighton, Jr, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.(Mitchell, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
21 21 service Certificate of Service Fri 01/03 4:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc., Tyrone Wrighton, Jr, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC Offer of Settlement (Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Fri 01/03 12:28 PM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's19 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file an amended complaint reflecting the substitution of parties and to serve it within 30 days and in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 1/3/2025. (ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
19 19 motion Amend Wed 12/18 3:07 PM
First MOTION to Amend Complaint by Kim Hoang Lee.(Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Liability Insurance,
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendant's Initial Disclosures,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - U.S. Department of Transportation Licensing and Insurance Public Page
18 18 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 12/18 3:03 PM
First Initial Disclosures by Kim Hoang Lee.(Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/18 3:01 PM
First Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kim Hoang Lee. (Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/18 1:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:14 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery shall proceed on an 8-month discovery track, to commence on the date of this order. Dispositive motions and Daubert motions shall be filed no later than 30 days after the close of discovery. If no dispositive motions are filed, the parties' proposed consolidated pretrial order shall be filed no later than 45 days after the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 12/18/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Mon 12/16 1:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.(Mitchell, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
14 14 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 12/13 3:23 PM
First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Kim Hoang Lee. (Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
13 13 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 12/10 12:32 PM
Initial Disclosures by Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc., Tyrone Wrighton, Jr, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.(Mitchell, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Mon 12/02 12:46 PM
Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Nahra Oh replacing attorney Chelsea Spampinato. (Oh, Nahra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/19 2:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING attorney Matthew Stone's8 Leave of Absence. IT IS ORDERED that this Court will excuse Mr. Stone from any need to make a personal appearance before the Court for the above-stated time period. However, counsel is not relieved from any filing or other case-related deadlines. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 11/19/2024. (ane)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
10 10 30+ pgs order Order Fri 11/15 5:12 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 11/15/2024. (sap)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 11/15 9:13 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Chelsea Spampinato. Clerk to follow-up by 11/25/2024. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
8 8 misc Leave of Absence Thu 11/14 12:05 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): November 26-December 4, 2024, December 24-January 7, 2025, January 13-January 31, 2025, March 14-April 4, 2025, July 25-August 15, 2025, October 15-October 17, 2025, November 26-December 2, 2025, December 24-January 7, 2026, by Matthew Peter Stone. (Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/14 11:57 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc., Tyrone Wrighton, Jr identifying Other Affiliate Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. for Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. (Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Thu 11/14 11:53 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc., Tyrone Wrighton, Jr(Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing
5 5 misc Jury Demand Thu 11/14 11:45 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc., Tyrone Wrighton, Jr. (Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 11/14 9:01 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Tyrone Wrighton, Jr. Filed in State Court of Dekalb County on 11/13/2024.(ajw)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 11/14 9:00 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc. Filed in State Court of Dekalb County on 11/13/2024.(ajw)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 11/14 8:59 AM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC. Filed in State Court of Dekalb on 11/13/2024. Discovery ends on 4/14/2025.(ajw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 11/14 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13862415) filed by Transtar Insurance Brokers, Inc., Tyrone Wrighton, Jr., Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - pleadings filed,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - GA corporate information Swift,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - AZ corporate information Knight Swift,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - GA corporate information Transtar,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet