Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:24-bk-33690
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Dec 11, 2024
Terminated:Jan 21, 2025

Debtor
Imaginations VR, Inc.
2229 Stanmore Ln
Plano, TX 75025-5539
Represented By
Mark S. Rubin
Rubin & Associates PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Anne Elizabeth Burns
900 Jackson Street, Suite 570
Dallas, TX 75202
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 11/15/2024 1:09 AM CST
Thursday, November 14, 2024
crditcrd none Thu 11/14 2:21 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload)([LINK 24-33690 7] ) [caseupld,1027u] ( 338.00). Receipt number A31968752, amount $ 338.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 33 pgs caseupld Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (case upload) Thu 11/14 2:18 PM
Non-Individual Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (case upload) filed by Mark S. Rubin of Rubin & Associates PC on behalf of Imaginations VR, Inc.. (Rubin, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of creditors 7 bus. no asset - AutoAssign Thu 11/14 2:22 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Burns, Anne Elizabeth with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/11/2024 at 12:30 PM via Zoom - Burns: Meeting ID 603 410 0887, Passcode 5831589282, Phone 1-469-218-9155. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is future date. (Rubin, Mark)
Related: [-]