Arizona District Court
Judge:Stephen M Mcnamee
Case #: 2:24-cv-03178
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Case in other court:Ninth Circuit, 25-02642
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 1:55 AM MST
Defendant
John McInelly
Represented By
Amy Talburt Matchison
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Moira Goodwin
Us Dept Of Justice - Tax Division
contact info
Defendant
United States Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
Amy Talburt Matchison
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Moira Goodwin
Us Dept Of Justice - Tax Division
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Amy Talburt Matchison
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Moira Goodwin
Us Dept Of Justice - Tax Division
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Werfel
Represented By
Amy Talburt Matchison
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
Moira Goodwin
Us Dept Of Justice - Tax Division
contact info
Plaintiff
ERC Today LLC
Represented By
Peter Ayer Arhangelsky
Greenberg Traurig Llp - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
Stenson Tamaddon LLC
Represented By
Peter Ayer Arhangelsky
Greenberg Traurig Llp - Phoenix
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 9:09 AM MST
Friday, April 25, 2025
33 33 1 pgs appeal USCA Case Number Fri 04/25 4:03 PM
USCA Case Number re:32 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Case number 25-2642 Ninth Circuit. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
32 32 36 pgs appeal Notice of Interlocutory Appeal Wed 04/23 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:27 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon LLC. Filing fee received: $ 605.00, receipt number AAZDC-24217962. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
31 31 misc Transcript Thu 04/17 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING proceedings held on 03/28/2025 before Judge STEPHEN M. MCNAMEE. [Court Reporter: Kimberly Portik, RMR, CRR, CRC, Telephone number (602) 322-7249]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 5/7/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2025. (RAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
30 30 2 pgs misc Transcript Request Wed 04/09 4:13 PM
AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 29 Notice of Deficiency re: A0435 28 Transcript Request filed by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon LLC for proceedings held on 03/28/2025, Judge Stephen M McNamee hearing judge(s). (Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
29 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO43528 Transcript Request filed by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon LLC. Item 18 - ORDER: E-mail address not provided where e-mail copy should be sent. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile and provide an email address for delivery in section 18. DELIVERY INSTRUCTIONS. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Transcript Request Wed 04/09 2:02 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon LLC for proceedings held on 03/28/2025, Judge Stephen M McNamee hearing judge(s). (Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Deficiency re Transcript Request Wed 04/09 4:06 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO43528 Transcript Request filed by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon LLC. Item 18 - ORDER: E-mail address not provided where e-mail copy should be sent. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile and provide an email address for delivery in section 18. DELIVERY INSTRUCTIONS. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
27 27 29 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Mon 04/07 5:07 PM
ORDER denying18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 4/7/2025. (KMB)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
26 26 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 3/28/2025. Argument heard. IT IS ORDERED taking the matter under advisement. APPEARANCES: Peter Arhangelsky for Plaintiffs. Amy Matchison for Defendants. (Court Reporter Kim Portik.) Hearing held 1:23 PM to 2:53 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
minutes Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) Fri 03/28 4:41 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 3/28/2025. Argument heard. IT IS ORDERED taking the matter under advisement. APPEARANCES: Peter Arhangelsky for Plaintiffs. Amy Matchison for Defendants. (Court Reporter Kim Portik.) Hearing held 1:23 PM to 2:53 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
25 25 IT IS ORDERED the Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for March 28, 2025 at 1:30 PM, is RESET AS TO LOCATION ONLY! The Preliminary Injunction Hearing will be held in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee. Ordered by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/26/2025. (KMB)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
order Time Change Only - Motion Hearing Wed 03/26 12:20 PM
IT IS ORDERED the Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for March 28, 2025 at 1:30 PM, is RESET AS TO LOCATION ONLY! The Preliminary Injunction Hearing will be held in Courtroom 604, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee. Ordered by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/26/2025. (KMB)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
24 24 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/19 2:37 PM
NOTICE by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon LLC re:23 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, . (Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Mon 03/10 2:40 PM
ORDER setting a Preliminary Injunction Hearing for March 28, 2025 at 1:30 PM before the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee in Courtroom #401 of the Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona, 85003. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file a joint notice no later than March 21, 2025 advising the Court whether testimony from live witnesses will be elicited at the hearing. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 3/10/2025. (KMB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
22 22 26 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/28 8:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon LLC.(Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of E. Stenson,
Att: 2 Exhibit 40
Friday, January 31, 2025
21 21 34 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/31 2:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by United States of America.(Matchison, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 19 pgs Declaration of Douglas O'Donnell
Friday, January 24, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 01/24 10:08 AM
ORDER approving the Stipulation (Doc.19 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED allowing Defendants up to and including 30 days after the Court rules on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/24/2025. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
19 19 3 pgs misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Thu 01/23 2:38 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by United States of America.(Matchison, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
18 18 32 pgs motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 01/07 11:22 AM
*MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon LLC.(Arhangelsky, Peter) *Modified filers on 1/10/2025 (KJ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Proposed Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 01/06 11:38 AM
ORDER approving the Joint Stipulation. (Doc.16 ). Plaintiffs have up to and including 1/8/2025 to file a Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants have up to and including 1/31/2025 to file a Response. Plaintiffs have up to and including 2/28/2025 to file a Reply in support. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/6/2025. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
16 16 3 pgs misc Stipulation Mon 12/23 2:08 PM
*STIPULATION to Set Scheduling Order by ERC Today LLC, Stentson Tamaddon LLC.(Arhangelsky, Peter) *Modified filers on 12/26/2024 (KJ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 12/20 4:06 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice the Joint Stipulation. (Doc.14 ). The parties may refile a stipulation with a new proposed order attached. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/20/2024. (KJ)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation Fri 12/20 2:19 PM
STIPULATION to Set Scheduling Order by ERC Today LLC.(Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
13 13 service Service Executed Wed 12/18 11:06 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ERC Today LLC: Certificate of Service re: LETTER; SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION; VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; CIVIL COVER SHEET; PLAINTIFFS MOTIONFOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN EXCESS OF THE PAGE LIMIT; PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ANDMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT; EXHIBITS 1-39 ON USB upon United States Attorney General on 12/12/24. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service Executed Wed 12/18 11:04 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ERC Today LLC: Certificate of Service re: SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION; VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; CIVIL COVER SHEET; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN EXCESS OF THE PAGE LIMIT; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT upon John McInelly c/o Office of Chief Counsel on 12/13/24. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service Executed Wed 12/18 11:02 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ERC Today LLC: Certificate of Service re: SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION; VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; CIVIL COVER SHEET; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN EXCESS OF THE PAGE LIMIT; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT upon Daniel Werfel, Commissioner on 12/13/24. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Service Executed Wed 12/18 11:01 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ERC Today LLC: Certificate of Service re: SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION; VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; CIVIL COVER SHEET; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN EXCESS OF THE PAGE LIMIT; PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT; FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT upon United States Internal Revenue Service on 12/13/24. (Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Wed 12/18 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Moira Goodwin on behalf of John McInelly, Daniel Werfel, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. (Goodwin, Moira)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 12/13 4:07 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion. (Doc.6 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking the Motion for Preliminary Injunction lodged by Plaintiffs. (Doc.7 ). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/13/2024. (KJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
7 7 33 pgs respoth Lodged Proposed Document Wed 12/11 10:36 AM
LODGED Proposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction re:6 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Leave to File Motion for a Preliminary Injunction in Excess of the Page Limit . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon, LLC.(Arhangelsky, Peter) *Modified filers on 12/11/2024 (KJ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Proposed Order Proposed Order
6 6 motion Leave to File Document Wed 12/11 10:31 AM
*MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Leave to File Motion for a Preliminary Injunction in Excess of the Page Limit by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon, LLC.(Arhangelsky, Peter) *Modified filers on 12/11/2024 (KJ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 11/27 7:34 AM
Summons Issued as to John McInelly, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America c/o United States Attorney General, Daniel Werfel.(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
4 4 service Summons Submitted Tue 11/26 1:32 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by ERC Today LLC.(Arhangelsky, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons,
Att: 3 2 pgs Summons
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
3 3 misc New Case Opened Thu 11/14 12:07 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23667252. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Stephen M McNamee. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-03178 PHX-SMM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 11/14 12:06 PM
Disclosure Statement by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon LLC. (submitted by Peter Arhangelsky) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 77 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/14 11:56 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23667252 filed by ERC Today LLC, Stenson Tamaddon LLC. (submitted by Peter Arhangelsky)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-10,
Att: 2 Exhibit 11-15,
Att: 3 Exhibit 16-17,
Att: 4 Exhibit 18-26,
Att: 5 Exhibit 27-39,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet