Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-01715
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2024 1:40 AM CST
Defendant
Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Darrell Lee Bryan
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cahal Patrick McColgan
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/15/2024 3:11 AM CST
Monday, October 14, 2024
Arrest of Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera, filed. (le7) [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 10/16/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (le7) (dnr7). [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera, filed. (le7) [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera held on 10/16/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Alexa Dinsmore Parcell, AUSA; Jose Martinez, AFPD. (USPO: Susana Vargas) (ERO: 10:01 AM) (Interpreter: Cristina Helmerichs and Woody Lewis, used) (DUSM: Lorenzo Billescas). (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Darrell Lee Bryan, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera, filed. (Bryan, Darrell) [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Cahal Patrick McColgan appearing for USA, filed. (McColgan, Cahal) [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, ) [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera, filed. [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera, filed. (ld7) [7:24-mj-01786]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera (1) count(s) 1, filed. (cb7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Jose Angel Bernal-Olvera, filed. (cb7)
Related: [-]