Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00633
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2024 1:41 AM CST
Defendant
Paola Denise Martinez (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Brownsville
contact info
Hector F Garza
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Luis Salazar
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/15/2024 3:12 AM CST
Friday, November 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Paola Denise Martinez (1), filed. (dar1) (dar1). [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/4/2024) Unredacted attachment
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Paola Denise Martinez, Arrested on 11/01/2024, filed. (dar1) (dar1). [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/4/2024) Unredacted attachment
Monday, November 04, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 11/4/2024 as to Paola Denise Martinez. Defendant sworn in. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. Defendant examined by U.S. Probation Office. COUNSEL DETERMINATION HEARING held. Defendant requests court appointed counsel. After review of the Financial Affidavit, the Court finds the defendant qualifies for the appointment of counsel. The Court will appoint counsel to represent the Defendant. In the event the defendant is able to hire private counsel, deft shall reimburse appointed counsel for costs incurred up to such time that new counsel enters his/her appearance. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 11/7/2024 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. Defendant held without bond. Detention Hearing set for 11/7/2024 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, counsel for the United States is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances:Paul Marian, AUSA; Hector Garza, AFFPD.(USPO:Cindy Gonzalez)(ERO:Efrain Garcia) (Interpreter:Jenny Ortiz, present not needed) (DUSM: M Barron/ H Martinez) (CSO: Joe Barreda) (bav1)[9:32 - 10:12 AM] [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Federal Public Defender - Brownsville for Paola Denise Martinez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (bav1) [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Paola Denise Martinez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (bav1) [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination by Paola Denise Martinez, filed. (Garza, Hector) [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Paola Denise Martinez, filed. [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Luis Salazar appearing for USA, filed. (Salazar, Luis) [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Paola Denise Martinez, filed. (ym1) [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: DETENTION HEARING NOT HELD as to Paola Denise Martinez held on 11/7/2024. Case called. Parties present. Defense counsel makes an oral request for a continuance to allow Pretrial to speak to Defendant's grandfather; granted. Detention Hearing reset for 11/8/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances:Luis Salazar, AUSA; Hector Garza f/dft.(USPO:C Senteno/E Castillo)(ERO:Efrain Garcia) (Interpreter:Jenny Ortiz, present not needed) (DUSM: S Sleep/M Barron) (CSO: Dan Delgado) (bav1)[11:14 - 11:19 AM] [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
***Reset Hearings as to Paola Denise Martinez: Detention Hearing set for 11/8/2024 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt (bav1) [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
8 8 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Paola Denise Martinez, filed. (ym1) [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt: DETENTION HEARING as to Paola Denise Martinez held on 11/8/2024. After review of the PSA report and arguments of counsel, the Court finds there is no condition or combination of conditions that would reasonably assure the defendant's appearance at further court proceedings or safeguard the community and orders defendant held without bond pending further proceedings. If new evidence arises, the Court is not opposed to reopen the case for a Detention Hearing.Deft remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances:Paul Marian standing in for Luis Salazar, AUSA; Hector Garza, AFPD f/dft.(USPO:C Senteno/E Castillo)(ERO:Efrain Garcia) (Interpreter:Jenny Ortiz, present not needed) (DUSM: D Figueroa/M Barron) (CSO: Dan Delgado) (bav1)[11:14 - 11:22 AM] [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING Trial as to Paola Denise Martinez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt) Parties notified. (dlr1) [1:24-mj-00639]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
10 10 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Paola Denise Martinez (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, filed. (jmt1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
11 11 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Paola Denise Martinez, filed. (jmt1)
Related: [-]