Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-07986
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2024 12:27 AM MST
Defendant
Paola Trevino (1)
Represented By
Gregory Jon Berger
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christine Anne Melton
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/15/2024 1:37 AM MST
Saturday, October 19, 2024
Arrest of Paola Trevino on 10/19/2024. (CMB) [4:24-mj-05115-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
1 1 *COMPLAINT as to Paola Trevino. (CMB) *Modified on 10/21/2024 to correct filed date (CMB). [4:24-mj-05115-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera: Initial Appearance as to Paola Trevino held on 10/21/2024. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Gregory Jon Berger for Paola Trevino with Appointment Type: FPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant(s) temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Spanish Interpreter required. In the presence of government and defense counsel, the Court orally advises the government of their Brady obligation. Written order to follow. Appearances : AUSA Brian Hopkins, duty for the Government, AFPD Gregory Berger for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Carlos Arvizu assists defendant. Detention Hearing set for 10/23/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/23/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich. Related [+] Hearing held 2:22 PM to 3:02 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) [4:24-mj-05115-N/A-JR]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Under federal law, including Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions from the Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit interpreting Brady , the government has a continuing obligation to produce all information or evidence known to the government relating to guilt or punishment that might reasonably be considered favorable to the defendant's case, even if the evidence is not admissible so long as it is reasonably likely to lead to admissible evidence. See United States v. Price , 566 F.3d 900,913 n.14 (9th Cir. 2009). Accordingly, the court orders the government to produce to the defendant in a timely manner all such information or evidence. Information or evidence may be favorable to a defendant's case if it either may help bolster the defendant's case or impeach a prosecutor's witness or other government evidence. If doubt exists, it should be resolved in favor of the defendant with full disclosure being made. If the government believes that a required disclosure would compromise witness safety, victim rights, national security, a sensitive law-enforcement technique, or any other substantial government interest, the government may apply to the Court for a modification of the requirements of this Disclosure Order, which may include in camera review and/or withholding or subjecting to a protective order all or part of the information. This Disclosure Order is entered under Rule 5(f) and does not relieve any party in this matter of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating either this Disclosure Order or the government's obligations under Brady include, but are not limited to, the following: contempt, sanction, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. Nothing in this Disclosure Order enlarges or diminishes the government's obligation to disclose information and evidence to a defendant under Brady , as interpreted and applied under Supreme Court and Ninth Circuit precedent. As the Supreme Court noted, "the government violates the Constitution's Due Process Clause 'if it withholds evidence that is favorable to the defense and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment." ' Turner v. United States , 137 S. Ct. 1885, 1888 (2017), quoting Smith v. Cain , 565 U.S. 73, 75 (2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera.(CXE)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:24-mj-05115-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Paola Trevino. (CXE) [4:24-mj-05115-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
6 6 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich: Detention Hearing addressed as to Paola Trevino on 10/23/2024. Defendant's information remains unverified. Upon oral motion by defense counsel, without objection, IT IS ORDERED continuing the Detention Hearing as indicated below. Preliminary Hearing as to Paola Trevino waived on 10/23/2024. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Appearances : AUSA Carin Duryee (duty) for the Government, AFPD Greg Berger for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Ignacio Barrientos/Liliana Nido-Zawacki assists defendant. Detention Hearing set for 10/29/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. Related [+] Hearing held 10:49 AM to 10:57 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REC) [4:24-mj-05115-N/A-JR]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
8 8 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Detention Hearing as to Paola Trevino held on 10/29/2024. Pretrial Services recommends release per the Addendum to the Report dated 10/28/2024. Government requests detention. Defense counsel argues for release. Defendant is ordered released on own recognizance. Defendant advised of conditions of release. Defendant shall be transported bag and baggage to the Sandra Day O'Connor Courthouse U. S. Marshal cell block for release on October 30, 2024. Appearances : AUSA Kelly Cavanaugh (duty) for the Government, AFPD Gregory Berger for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Lucinda Bush assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 11:17 AM to 11:54 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REC) [4:24-mj-05115-N/A-JR]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Paola Trevino.Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 10/30/24. (REC) [4:24-mj-05115-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
10 10 NOTICE re: PASSPORT as to Paola Trevino. Defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport and/or passport card during the pendency of this action. (JAG) [4:24-mj-05115-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
11 11 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY CONTRABAND by USA as to Paola Trevino. (Melton, Christine) [4:24-mj-05115-N/A-JR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
12 12 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Paola Trevino (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6. Arraignment set for 12/6/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. Counsel to advise defendants wishing to waive their appearance at the Arraignment Hearing of the following proposed dates: Trial: 1/14/2025; Plea Deadline: 12/27/2024. NOTE: The process for waiving defendant's appearance at Arraignment has changed. There is no longer a need to file a Notice of Intent to File Waiver of Defendants Appearance. Instead, signed appearance waivers may be electronically filed using the Waiver of Defendants Presence at Arraignment and Acknowledgement of Trial Date event. The event is located under Criminal Event Categories: Other Filings/Waivers. The signed Waiver must be filed no later than 12:00 PM the business day prior to the scheduled arraignment. Failure of defense counsel to file a timely waiver (or a timely motion to continue) may result in the reappointment of defense counsel. (SCA)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
14 14 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Paola Trevino. (DLC)
Related: [-]