Rhode Island District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00094
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2024 2:21 AM EST
Defendant
Robert Consorti (1)
Represented By
Kevin J. Fitzgerald
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
Kara Hoopis Manosh
Manosh Payette, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John P McAdams
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/15/2024 3:37 AM EST
Thursday, October 17, 2024
Arrest of Robert Consorti. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan:Initial Appearance as to Robert Consorti held on 10/17/2024, Bond Hearing as to Robert Consorti held on 10/17/2024. John McAdams for the Government, Kevin Fitzgerald for the Defendant; Tim Donohue for Probation. All counsel of record present. Deft and Probation present. Court informs Deft of rights; Deft understands; Court provisionally appoints FPD on behalf of Deft; Court schedules Preliminary/Determination of Counsel Hearing for 10/29/2024 at 10AM; Govt Motions to unseal case, except for the Affidavit; Court grants Motion, Govt is directed to file redacted version of Affidavit; Court informs Deft of pending charges; Deft understands; Court enters Due Process Protections Act Order; Govt argues for detention; Defense argues for release on conditions; Court orders Deft released on Conditions; Court informs Deft of potential penalties if conditions of release are violated; Deft understands; Court orders Deft released on $10,000 UNSECURED Appearance Bond and Conditions; Deft released on conditions; recess. (Court Reporter FTR in Courtroom B at 5:26PM) (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Robert Consorti. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER granting Motion to Unseal Case as to Robert Consorti (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/17/2024. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Robert Consorti. Preliminary/ Determination of Counsel Hearing set for 10/29/2024 10:00 at AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Robert Consorti.(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Case as to Robert Consorti (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/17/2024.(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
3 3 COMPLAINT as to Robert Consorti (1).(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Attachments,
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet
6 6 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Robert Consorti (Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER PROVISIONALLY APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Robert Consorti. Kevin J. Fitzgerald for Robert Consorti provisionally appointed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/17/2024. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER PURSUANT TO DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Robert Consorti. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/17/2024. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
10 10 Appearance Bond Entered as to Robert Consorti in amount of $ 10,000 UNSECURED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/17/2024. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
11 11 REDACTED AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Robert Consorti. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Robert Consorti (1) $10,00 UNSECURED Appearance Bond. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/17/2024. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/17/2024. in case as to Robert Consorti. (Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
13 13 MOTION to Continue by Robert Consorti. Responses due by 11/7/2024. (Fitzgerald, Kevin) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/25/2024) (DaCruz, Kayla). [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
TEXT ORDER granting13 Motion to Continue as to Robert Consorti (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/25/2024. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
HEARING CANCELLED as to Robert Consorti: NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Robert Consorti. Preliminary/ Determination of Counsel Hearing set for 10/29/2024 10:00 at AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Court to reschedule. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Robert Consorti. Preliminary/ Determination of Counsel Hearing set for 11/5/2024 10:00 at AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
TEXT ORDER granting14 Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing and Determination of Counsel hearing as to Robert Consorti (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 11/4/2024.(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
HEARING CANCELLED re Preliminary/ Determination of Counsel Hearing set for 11/5/2024 10:00 at AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan as to Robert Consorti has been cancelled. Court to reschedule.(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Robert Consorti. Preliminary Hearing/Determination of Counsel Hearing set for 11/15/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan.(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
14 14 MOTION to Continue by Robert Consorti. Responses due by 11/18/2024. (Fitzgerald, Kevin) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Robert Consorti. Attorney Kevin J. Fitzgerald terminated. (DaCruz, Kayla) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF FORFEITURE ALLEGATION by USA as to Robert Consorti re16 Indictment. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
HEARING CANCELLED re: NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Robert Consorti. Preliminary Hearing/Determination of Counsel Hearing set for 11/15/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Robert Consorti. Arraignment set for 11/15/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kara Hoopis Manosh appearing for Robert Consorti (Hoopis Manosh, Kara) [1:24-mj-00086-PAS]
Related: [-]
16 16 INDICTMENT as to Robert Consorti (1) count(s) 1, 2. (DaCruz, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet