Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-02595
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2024 2:08 AM CST
Defendant
Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza (1)
Represented By
Christina M. Norton
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/15/2024 6:01 AM CST
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
Arrest of Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza (ll) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza. (ll) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza. (ll) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza held on 10/17/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (T. McEneny) as to Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING HEARING as to Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza, (Detention Hearing set for 10/22/2024 03:30 PM in El Paso before Judge Robert F. Castaneda, Preliminary Hearing set for 10/22/2024 03:30 PM in El Paso before Judge Robert F. Castaneda), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christina M. Norton appearing for Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza . Attorney Christina M. Norton added to party Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza(pty:dft) (Norton, Christina) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza (Norton, Christina) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patricia Aguayo appearing for USA. . Attorney Patricia Aguayo added to party USA(pty:pla) (Aguayo, Patricia) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: DETAIN WITHOUT BOND as to Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:24-mj-04358-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bot2)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Juan Manuel Esparza-Esparza (bot1)
Related: [-]