California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:24-cv-07962
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 1:30 AM PST
Defendant
815-847 Arnold Drive, LLC
Represented By
Kurt A. Franklin
Fennemore Wendel
contact info
Defendant
National Seating & Mobility, Inc.
Represented By
Steven J. Joffe
Wilsonelser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Lucy Khabay Galek
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisca Moralez
Represented By
Tanya Eugene Moore
Moore Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 04/18 5:02 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal of Action filed by Francisca Moralez. (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
19 19 adr Notice of Settlement of ADA Access Case - ADA Access Cases Only Fri 03/28 5:11 PM
Notice of Settlement of ADA Access Case by Tanya Eugene Moore (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
18 18 order Order on Stipulation Thu 03/06 1:24 PM
Order by Judge James Donato granting 17 Stipulation. At the joint request of the parties, the deadline for conducting the joint site inspection under General Order 56 is extended to March 31, 2025. Unless the matter is fully resolved, the joint site inspection shall take place on March 31, 2025, commencing by 11:00 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 02/25 1:45 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME FOR PARTIES TO CONDUCT JOINT SITE INSPECTION filed by 815-847 Arnold Drive, LLC. (Franklin, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
16 16 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 02/06 3:17 PM
Order by Judge James Donato granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Conduct Joint Site Inspection. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
15 15 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 01/27 2:31 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR PARTIES TO CONDUCT JOINT SITE INSPECTION filed by 815-847 Arnold Drive, LLC. (Franklin, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/17 1:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by 815-847 Arnold Drive, LLC. (Franklin, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/03 8:56 AM
NOTICE by 815-847 Arnold Drive, LLC Notice of Change of Firm Name (Franklin, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
12 12 misc Jury Demand Mon 12/30 1:59 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by National Seating & Mobility, Inc.. (Galek, Lucy)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 12/23 10:04 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT 815-847 ARNOLD DRIVE, LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by 815-847 Arnold Drive, LLC. (Franklin, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 12/17 4:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Seating & Mobility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent WCM NSM Aquisition Corporation, Corporate Parent WCM NSM Aquisition Corporation for National Seating & Mobility, Inc.. (Galek, Lucy)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/17 4:11 PM
Defendant National Seating & Mobility, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by National Seating & Mobility, Inc.. (Galek, Lucy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/05 4:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisca Moralez. 815-847 Arnold Drive, LLC served on 11/26/2024, answer due 12/17/2024. (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/05 4:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisca Moralez. National Seating & Mobility, Inc. served on 11/26/2024, answer due 12/17/2024. (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 11/20 5:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Francisca Moralez (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Fri 11/15 9:51 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
4 4 1 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 11/15 9:45 AM
Summons Issued as to 815-847 Arnold Drive, LLC, National Seating & Mobility, Inc. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 11/14 7:54 AM
Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20045980.). Filed by Francisca Moralez.(Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet