Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:J Nicholas Ranjan
Case #: 2:24-cv-01566
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
Christopher Fabian
Defendant
Hickory Township Pennsylvania
Defendant
Armande Perrotta
Defendant
WILLIAM W. DEAN
Defendant
MICHAEL E. HALL
Plaintiff
RANDALL COOK, JR.
Represented By
John J. Bongivengo
John J. Bongivengo, Esquire
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
21 21 order Order Wed 04/16 3:47 PM
SANCTIONS ORDER. After careful review of the relevant law, procedural history, and Plaintiff's counsel's20 response to the Show-Cause Order, the Court, pursuant to Rule 16(f) and its inherent authority, hereby orders sanctions against Plaintiff's counsel, as follows. First, the Court orders Plaintiff's counsel to pay defense counsel reasonable attorneys' fees for defense counsel to prepare for and attend the conference. The Court, approximating a reasonable amount of time as.5 hours and using the traditional Philadelphia CLS fee table, finds that the amount of the sanction shall be $400. Plaintiff's counsel shall pay the $400 by check to defense counsel's firm forthwith. Second, the Court has concerns over Plaintiff's counsel's calendaring "system," and has no confidence that whatever system is being used is reliable. Therefore, Plaintiff's counsel shall investigate purchasing and downloading a reliable law-firm calendaring software program; there are dozens of such programs (many are free), which many small firms and solo practitioners use to comply with deadlines and avoid malpractice suits and disciplinary action. Plaintiff's counsel shall investigate obtaining such a program, and after that investigation, then develop a reliable calendaring system based on the available technology. If Plaintiffs counsel currently uses such technology, then he must investigate more advanced technology that will avoid missed court dates and deadlines. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a notice of compliance as to the foregoing (i.e., the $400 payment and the calendaring system), including a detailed description of the investigation into the calendaring programs and what reliable system is being utilized and how it is being used. Plaintiffs counsels notice of compliance shall be filed on June 16, 2025. The notice of compliance shall not be filed before this date, so that Plaintiff's counsel has sufficient time to obtain and then test the reliability of any new system. In the meantime, this case is hereby STAYED. The parties shall engage in no discovery and shall cancel the ADR session with the mediator immediately. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/16/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
20 20 motion Show Cause Tue 04/15 2:37 PM
Response re Order to Show Cause by RANDALL COOK, JR.. (Bongivengo, John) Modified text on 4/15/2025. (pak)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/15 11:39 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On April 15, 2025, at 10:00 a.m., the Court held the initial case management conference in this case. Defense counsel appeared. Plaintiff's counsel did not. This appears to be a troubling pattern with Plaintiff's counsel. In another recent case with Plaintiff's counsel (Civil No. 24-1032 , Plaintiff's counsel did not appear for the initial case management conference. The Court issued a show-cause Order in that case, and Plaintiff's counsel never responded to that. Based on the Court's inherent authority and authority under Rule 16(f), Plaintiff's counsel shall file a response to this Order to show cause why sanctions shall not be imposed, including without limitation, payment of defense counsel's reasonable attorneys' fees in preparing for and attending the Court conference, and possible dismissal of this action. Plaintiff's counsel's response to this Order shall be filed by 5:00 p.m. today, April 15, 2025 . Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/15/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Tue 04/15 11:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: The date and time set for an Initial Case Management Conference on 4/15/2025. (pak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
17 17 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Thu 04/03 11:36 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by WILLIAM W. DEAN, Christopher Fabian, MICHAEL E. HALL, Hickory Township Pennsylvania, Armande Perrotta. (Gabriel, Brian)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 04/03 11:35 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gabriel, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
15 15 adr Notice of Mediation Wed 03/26 9:15 PM
Notice of Mediation by Sally Griffith Cimini. Mediation Date May 27, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 misc Proposed Rule 26(f) report Thu 03/13 12:22 PM
Proposed Rule 26(f) report. (pak)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Case Management Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/13 12:22 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 4/7/2025. An Initial Case Management Conference is set for 4/15/2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 3/13/2025. (pak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/12 1:31 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by WILLIAM W. DEAN, Christopher Fabian, MICHAEL E. HALL, Hickory Township Pennsylvania, Armande Perrotta. (Gabriel, Brian) Modified text on 3/12/2025 to add link. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
11 11 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/04 8:44 AM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by Armande Perrotta, MICHAEL E. HALL, Christopher Fabian, Hickory Township Pennsylvania, WILLIAM W. DEAN Answer due from All Defendants. (Gabriel, Brian)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allison N. Genard on behalf of WILLIAM W. DEAN, Christopher Fabian, MICHAEL E. HALL, Hickory Township Pennsylvania, Armande Perrotta. (Genard, Allison)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/04 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Gabriel on behalf of WILLIAM W. DEAN, Christopher Fabian, MICHAEL E. HALL, Hickory Township Pennsylvania, Armande Perrotta. (Gabriel, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/16 9:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RANDALL COOK, JR.. WILLIAM W. DEAN waiver sent on 12/9/2024, answer due 2/7/2025. (Bongivengo, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/16 9:08 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RANDALL COOK, JR.. MICHAEL E. HALL waiver sent on 12/9/2024, answer due 2/7/2025. (Bongivengo, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/16 9:07 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RANDALL COOK, JR.. Christopher Fabian waiver sent on 12/9/2024, answer due 2/7/2025. (Bongivengo, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 01/16 9:06 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RANDALL COOK, JR.. Hickory Township Pennsylvania waiver sent on 12/9/2024, answer due 2/7/2025. (Bongivengo, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Thu 01/16 9:01 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RANDALL COOK, JR.. Hickory Township Pennsylvania served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025. (Bongivengo, John) Duplicate of5 and incorrect event; document removed from public view. Modified text on 1/16/2025. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
3 3 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Tue 12/03 10:50 AM
Errata re1 COMPLAINT, by RANDALL COOK, JR.. Reason for Correction: original pdf unreadable. (Bongivengo, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
misc QC - Duplicate Case Wed 11/20 2:18 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Duplicate cases opened. CORRECTION: Duplicate Case No. 2:24-cv-1565 deleted. (sms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
misc QC - PDF is unreadable Tue 11/19 8:49 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re2 Errata. ERROR: Original PDF still unreadable. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file an Errata with the attached readable PDF document. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
2 2 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Mon 11/18 12:28 PM
Errata re1 COMPLAINT, by RANDALL COOK, JR.. Reason for Correction: original unreadable. (Bongivengo, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, November 15, 2024
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Fri 11/15 6:27 AM
COMPLAINT against WILLIAM W. DEAN, Christopher Fabian, MICHAEL E. HALL, Hickory Township Pennsylvania, Armande Perrotta (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8561118), filed by Randall Cook, Jr. (Bongivengo, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 11/15 10:30 AM
Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. (jkn)
Related: [-]
misc QC - PDF is unreadable Fri 11/15 10:32 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT,. ERROR: Original PDFs unreadable. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file an Errata with the attached readable PDFs documents. (jkn)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply) Fri 11/15 2:22 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT,. ERROR: Missing county of residence for plaintiff on cover sheet. CORRECTION: File an errata with a cover sheet that includes plaintiff's county of residence. (jkn)
Related: [-]