Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Case #: 1:24-cv-24516
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Terminated:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
El Dorado Furniture Corporation
a Florida Profit Corporation 782 NW LE JEUNE ROAD SUITE 350
MIAMI, FL 33126
Represented By
Glenn Michael Rissman
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
Represented By
Samantha Lyn Simpson
Sconzo Law Office, P.A.
contact info
Gregory Steven Sconzo
Sconzo Law Office, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
12 12 order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 01/15 2:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER dismissing, with prejudice, this action in its entirety in light of the parties'11 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees except as provided for in the parties' settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/15/2025. (bs00)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Wed 01/15 12:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Howard Cohan (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 01/08 5:28 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of time to File Dismissal Documents. The parties shall file a Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal and/or Settlement Agreement along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action on or before February 7, 2025. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/8/2025. (bs00)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time Wed 01/08 4:01 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dismissal Documents by Howard Cohan. Responses due by 1/22/2025.(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 09, 2024
8 8 order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 12/09 10:52 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing this case in light of the Defendant's7 Statement in Response to Notice of Court Practice DE 5 and Notice of Settlement indicating that this action has been settled in full. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall file a Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal and/or Settlement Agreement along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/9/2024. (bs00)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
7 7 respm Response/Reply (Other) Fri 12/06 2:38 PM
Defendant's RESPONSE to 5 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,,,,, (and Notice of Settlement) by El Dorado Furniture Corporation. (Rissman, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 11/27 1:19 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Cohan. El Dorado Furniture Corporation served on 11/22/2024, response/answer due 12/13/2024. (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 11/19 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. The Complaint in this action is filed under the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. §§ 12181 et seq. In order to assist the Court in the management of this case, and in an effort to foster an early and cost-effective resolution, the parties are ORDERED as follows: Within fourteen (14) days of service of the Complaint, Defendant shall file a report with the Court indicating whether it agrees to (1) remediate the deficiencies identified in the Complaint, (2) entry of an injunction to ensure future compliance, and (3) pay Plaintiff's reasonable attorney's fees and costs, as determined by the Court or agreement by the parties. If so, Defendant shall include a reasonable timeline for remediation. If, upon review of the report, the Court finds that Defendant intends to remediate the property within a reasonable time, the action shall be stayed. If requested, the Court may grant proportional discovery to verify Defendant's remediation of the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint. After receiving notice from the parties that the ADA deficiencies outlined in the Complaint have been remediated, the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed order of dismissal, including an injunction for future compliance and an award of reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Disputes will be resolved by the Court. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/19/2024. (bs00)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 11/19 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/19/2024. (bs00)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 11/15 11:34 AM
Summons Issued as to El Dorado Furniture Corporation. (scn)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 11/15 11:30 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/15 10:55 AM
COMPLAINT against El Dorado Furniture Corporation. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17986878, filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)