California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Sean C Riordan
Case #: 2:24-cv-03161
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 2:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Jonathon Chen
Defendant
Franchise Tax Board
Defendant
Kern County Assessor-Recorder's Office
Plaintiff
Mathew-Allen McCaster
Mathias El Tribe, Chief and Tribal Historic Preseveration Officer 4305 Sun Devils Ave.
Bakersfield, CA 93313


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 motion Summary Judgment Tue 01/07 3:24 PM
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Mathew-Allen McCaster. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
4 4 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 12/18 12:11 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants and MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Mathew-Allen McCaster. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
misc IFP Application Fri 11/15 8:34 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 11/15 8:34 AM
MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Mathew-Allen McCaster. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Fri 11/15 8:33 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Mathew-Allen McCaster. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/15 8:31 AM
COMPLAINT against Jonathon Chen, Franchise Tax Board, Kern County Assessor-Recorder's Office by Mathew-Allen McCaster. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet