New Jersey District Court
Judge:Edward S Kiel
Referred: Ann Marie Donio
Case #: 1:24-cv-10533
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 6:20 AM EDT
Defendant
CORTEVA, INC.
Represented By
RYAN A. RICHMAN
Mccarter & English
contact info
LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Mccarter & English
contact info
Defendant
E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
Represented By
RYAN A. RICHMAN
Mccarter & English
contact info
LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Mccarter & English
contact info
Defendant
SOLVAY SOLEXIS, INC.
Defendant
SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC
Represented By
THEODORE V. WELLS, JR.
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP
contact info
Defendant
THE 3M COMPANY
Represented By
Michael C. Zogby
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
JAMES WYLIE CROWDER, IV
Bressler Amery & Ross PC
contact info
MICHAEL CHARLES ZOGBY
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
DONALD J. CAMERSON, II
Bressler, Amery & Ross, Esqs.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOE ENTITIES #1-10
Defendant
THE CHEMOURS COMPANY
Represented By
RYAN A. RICHMAN
Mccarter & English
contact info
LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Mccarter & English
contact info
Defendant
THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC
Represented By
RYAN A. RICHMAN
Mccarter & English
contact info
LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Mccarter & English
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARON DUPPER
Represented By
RUSSELL CURLEY
contact info
STEVE PHILLIPS
Phillipd & Paolicelli, LLP
contact info
VICTORIA ELIZABETH PHILLIPS
Levy Phillips Koningsberg LLP
contact info
MARC GORRIE
Phillips & Paolicelli, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 03, 2025
35 35 4 pgs order Order Mon 04/07 11:37 AM
ORDER DENYING TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 4/3/2025. (dmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/26 3:34 PM
LETTER ORDER Granting the joint request for the deadline to provide a proposed discovery plan be stayed until the resolution of the motion to transfer and completion of Group 2a discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/26/2025. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
33 33 misc Letter Fri 02/28 12:16 PM
Letter from Ryan Richman with respect to Stay of Deadline to Provide Discovery Plan. (RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
32 32 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 02/12 6:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CORTEVA, INC.. (RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 02/12 6:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC identifying The Chemours Company as Corporate Parent.. (RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 02/12 6:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY. (RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 02/12 6:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY identifying Corteva, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
28 28 order Order Tue 02/11 1:52 PM
TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 2/18/2025 shall be, and is hereby, adjourned. In lieu thereof, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed discovery plan to the Court by no later than 2/28/2025. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/11/2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
27 27 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 01/23 1:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE 3M COMPANY. (CAMERSON, DONALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
26 26 order Text Order Wed 01/22 3:47 PM
Text Only Entry from JPML panel - NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The Clerk of the Panel has determined this action is not appropriate for inclusion in MDL 2873. See Rule 7.1(b)(i).Signed by the Clerk of the Panel James V. Ingold on 1/21/2025. (dmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
25 25 6 pgs order Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden) Fri 01/17 9:41 AM
Order Initial Conference set for 2/18/2025 at 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/17/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 10:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY.(RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 10:28 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by CORTEVA, INC..(RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 10:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC.(RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 10:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by THE 3M COMPANY.(CAMERSON, DONALD)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 9:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES WYLIE CROWDER, IV on behalf of THE 3M COMPANY (CROWDER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 6:16 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC.(WELLS, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/16 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL on behalf of E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, CORTEVA, INC. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
17 17 order Stipulation and Order Wed 01/15 2:38 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding the Group 2a Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward S. Kiel on 1/15/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
16 16 misc Stipulation Mon 01/13 6:01 PM
STIPULATION and Order with respect to Motions to Dismiss by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, CORTEVA, INC..(KURZWEIL, LANNY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Solvay Specialty Polymers USA, LLC's Motion to Dismiss 133 ,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Arkema's Motion to Dismiss 135 ,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - EID, CC, CC FC, Inc's Motion to Dismiss 137 ,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 3M Company's Motion to Dismiss 138 ,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss 139 ,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Solvay's Reply Memorandum of Law 151 ,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - EID, CC and CC FC's Reply Memorandum of Law 149 ,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Arkema's Reply Memorandum of Law 152 ,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - 3M Company's Reply Memorandum of Law 153
Thursday, December 26, 2024
15 15 5 pgs order Order Thu 12/26 10:46 AM
ORDER BY CONSENT EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by 1/16/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/26/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
14 14 misc Proposed Order Tue 12/24 9:13 AM
Proposed Order by Consent Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint by SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC. (WELLS, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
13 13 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 12/13 3:55 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Corteva, Inc.. Attorney RYAN A. RICHMAN for CORTEVA, INC.,RYAN A. RICHMAN for E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY,RYAN A. RICHMAN for THE CHEMOURS COMPANY,RYAN A. RICHMAN for THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC added. (RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 12/13 3:53 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to The Chemours Company and The Chemours Company FC, LLC. Attorney RYAN A. RICHMAN for CORTEVA, INC.,RYAN A. RICHMAN for E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY,RYAN A. RICHMAN for THE CHEMOURS COMPANY,RYAN A. RICHMAN for THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC added. (RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 12/13 3:51 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to EIDP, Inc., formerly known as E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company. Attorney RYAN A. RICHMAN for CORTEVA, INC.,RYAN A. RICHMAN for E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY,RYAN A. RICHMAN for THE CHEMOURS COMPANY,RYAN A. RICHMAN for THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC added. (RICHMAN, RYAN)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 12/16 8:47 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order,12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order,13 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, CORTEVA, INC., THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been reset for 1/2/2025. (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 12/12 1:26 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney THEODORE V. WELLS, JR for SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC added. (WELLS, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 12/12 1:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC identifying Ausimont Industries and Solvay Holding, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (WELLS, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/12 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE V. WELLS, JR on behalf of SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC (WELLS, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Thu 12/12 4:11 PM
Clerk's Text Order - The document10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/2/2025. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
7 7 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 12/09 1:23 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney Michael C. Zogby for THE 3M COMPANY added. (ZOGBY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 12/10 9:07 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE 3M COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been reset for 1/2/2025. (js)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIA ELIZABETH PHILLIPS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PHILLIPS, VICTORIA)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RUSSELL CURLEY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (CURLEY, RUSSELL)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARC GORRIE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GORRIE, MARC)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 11/22 2:20 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by SHARON DUPPER. (PHILLIPS, STEVE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 11/20 1:38 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CORTEVA, INC., E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, SOLVAY SOLEXIS, INC., SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC, THE 3M COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sms2)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Wed 11/20 1:36 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Parties should be listed the exact way they appear on the complaint. Failure to do so will result in the caption generating incorrectly. Party Information; Parties should be listed the exact way they appear on the complaint. Parties listed in complaint were not included on the docket . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (sms2)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 11/20 1:36 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (sms2)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Wed 11/20 1:37 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
1 1 62 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/15 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against CHEMOURS COMPANY, CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, CORTEVA, INC., E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, SOLVAY SOLEXIS, INC., SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC, THE 3M COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15811766) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DUPPER SHARON.(PHILLIPS, STEVE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 11/18 1:21 PM
Judge Edward S. Kiel and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)
Related: [-]