Concepcion v. J. A. LAROCCO ENTERPRISES, INC. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-10088 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Nov 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 8:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
ALL KEYS CONCRETE LLC
101075 OVERSEAS HWY
Key Largo, FL 33037 |
|
Defendant
J. A. LAROCCO ENTERPRISES, INC.
424 SUNSHINE BLVD
TAVERNIER, FL 33070 |
|
Plaintiff
Miguel Concepcion
20900 NE 30th Avenue Suite 800
Aventura, FL 33180 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
order
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Mon 11/18 7:15 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - No Initiating Document filed/attached. No further entries will be made on this case . (bb) |