New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-08708
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331ed Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc.
Represented By
Shannon Danielle Azzaro
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Michael Alan Jakowsky
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hadi Mohammed
Represented By
Bradley Ross Siegel
The Siegel Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Michael Eric Kupferberg
The Siegel Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/07 9:00 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 22 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
22 22 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 05/06 9:49 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc. and without costs. Document filed by Hadi Mohammed. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Kupferberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Mon 05/05 9:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Michael Kupferberg. RE-FILE Document No. 21 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The docket entry text needs to match the document. When re-filing do not select that the dismissal is pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Your document does not cite to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/02 2:39 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Hadi Mohammed and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Hadi Mohammed. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Kupferberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/28 3:53 PM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/28/2025) (ar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/23 3:08 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Michael Kupferberg dated April 23, 2025. Document filed by Hadi Mohammed..(Kupferberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Wed 03/26 11:28 AM
ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE... It is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. All deadlines are adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/26/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 01/21 4:08 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/21/2025 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Mon 01/13 9:46 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/12/2025.(sge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
16 16 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 12/31 9:25 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 1/14/2025. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/01/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 10:27 AM
ANSWER to5 Complaint. Document filed by Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc...(Azzaro, Shannon)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/30 10:18 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc...(Azzaro, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/17 3:06 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc.Defendant is ORDERED to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before December 30, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/17/2024) answer due 12/13/2024 (ar)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/16 7:49 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:5 Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Shannon D. Azzaro dated December 16, 2024. Document filed by Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc...(Azzaro, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint Through and Including December 30, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/16 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Alan Jakowsky on behalf of Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc...(Jakowsky, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/16 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shannon Danielle Azzaro on behalf of Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc...(Azzaro, Shannon)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/16 3:16 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Shannon Azzaro dated 12/16/2024. Document filed by Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc...(Porta, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/26 2:26 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc. served on 11/25/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. Service was accepted by NY SOS. Document filed by Hadi Mohammed..(Siegel, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 11/19 9:20 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 11/19 9:14 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 11/19 9:19 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 11/19 9:19 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 11/18 1:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LIFES WORC ALLIANCE FOUNDATION, INC., re:5 Complaint. Document filed by Hadi Mohammed..(Siegel, Bradley)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint Mon 11/18 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc.. Document filed by Hadi Mohammed..(Siegel, Bradley)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/18 11:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Eric Kupferberg on behalf of Hadi Mohammed..(Kupferberg, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 11/18 10:01 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Bradley Ross Siegel to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; PDF title error. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 11/25/2024. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 11/18 10:02 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Bradley Ross Siegel to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; summons request must be linked to a properly filed pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/15 4:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Siegel, Bradley)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 11/15 4:49 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LIFES WORC ALLIANCE FOUNDATION, INC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Hadi Mohammed..(Siegel, Bradley)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/15 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Life's Worc Alliance Foundation, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30193464)Document filed by Hadi Mohammed..(Siegel, Bradley)
Related: [-]