Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Clifton L Corker
Referred: Michael J Dumitru
Case #: 1:24-cv-00364
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Marion County, 23448
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 4:49 AM EST
Defendant
Crum Trucking, Inc.
Represented By
Derek Wayne Mullins
Baker Donelson
contact info
Gary L Edwards, II
Baker Donelson
contact info
Defendant
Bradley L. Deters
Represented By
Derek Wayne Mullins
Baker Donelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Emmit L. Terry
Represented By
C Mark Warren
Warren & Griffin, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/29 1:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crum Trucking, Inc., Bradley L. Deters., filed by Emmit L. Terry.(Warren, C)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 01/29 11:57 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 14 Joint Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry no later than seven (7) days from entry of this order. This entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. (Dumitru, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Amend/Revise Wed 01/29 10:07 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint by Emmit L. Terry.(Warren, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Other Proposed Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
13 13 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/10 1:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/17/2026 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker. The expected length of trial is three (3) days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2026 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 1/10/2025. (LCK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 01/09 3:00 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mullins, Derek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Tue 01/07 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Bradley L. Deters, Crum Trucking, Inc. (Mullins, Derek)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/07 9:54 AM
United States Magistrate Judge Mike Dumitru added per SO 25-03. (KDO)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
10 10 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 11/25 11:12 AM
ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conference unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED : 1. As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/25/2024. (CAT)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Mon 11/25 9:48 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/25/2024. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent
Friday, November 22, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/22 6:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Bradley L. Deters, Crum Trucking, Inc..(Mullins, Derek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Tue 11/19 3:52 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/19/2024. (CAT)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Tue 11/19 3:50 PM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/19/2024. (CAT)
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Tue 11/19 3:49 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/19/2024. (CAT)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/19 3:44 PM
ORDER: The above-styled case has been reviewed pursuant to E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3), and the Court concludes this case is related to previously filed case No. 1:22-cv-0314-DCLC-SKL, styled Emmit L. Terry v. Bradley L. Deters and Crum Trucking, Inc. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign this case to the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to the previously filed case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/19/2024. (CAT)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 11/19 3:40 PM
District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
misc Public Docket Annotation Mon 11/18 1:53 PM
This case has been referred to United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee for a related case review to case 1:22cv314 DCLC/SKL. (JGF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Citizenship Fri 11/15 5:11 PM
Certificate of Citizenship by Crum Trucking, Inc.. (Mullins, Derek)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Fri 11/15 5:09 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Crum Trucking, Inc.. (Mullins, Derek)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 11/15 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Marion County, case number 23448. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5838083), filed by Crum Trucking, Inc..(Mullins, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Collective 1 - State Court Documents,
Att: 2 Exhibit Collective 2 - Plaintff and Clerk Notices,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet