New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Diane Gujarati
Case #: 1:24-cv-07969
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 5:17 AM EDT
Defendant
William Schwitzer
Represented By
John Frederick Carman
John Carman, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Patricio Cedillo
Defendant
Erik M. Barrezueta Orellana
Represented By
Jeff Alan Chabrowe
Law Office Of Jeffrey Chabrowe
contact info
Defendant
Wingate, Russotti, Shapiro, Moses & Halperin, LLP
Represented By
Jonathan David Cogan
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Sydney Sgambato Johnson
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Michael Joseph Cinnamon
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wilson Barrezueta
Represented By
McDonald Scott Worley
Mcdonald Worley LLC
contact info
Defendant
William Schwitzer & Associates, P.C.
Defendant
Freddy Fajardo
Defendant
Subin & Associates, LLC
Represented By
John J. Weinholtz
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Joseph John Ortego
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Defendant
Herbert S. Subin
Represented By
John J. Weinholtz
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Joseph John Ortego
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Defendant
Eric D. Subin
Represented By
John J. Weinholtz
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Joseph John Ortego
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Efrain Bravo
Represented By
Gary Farrell
Gary Farrell
contact info
Defendant
Clifford H. Shapiro
Represented By
Jonathan David Cogan
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Sydney Sgambato Johnson
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Michael Joseph Cinnamon
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Philip Russotti
Represented By
Jonathan David Cogan
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Sydney Sgambato Johnson
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Michael Joseph Cinnamon
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
I. Bryce Moses
Represented By
Jonathan David Cogan
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Sydney Sgambato Johnson
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Michael Joseph Cinnamon
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Milton Javier Guarango-Marin
Defendant
Miguel Angel Teleguario Tzay
Defendant
Johnny Geovanny Clavijos Fajardo
Defendant
John Does "1-50"
Defendant
Rosario Guillermina Cedillo
Defendant
Kenneth Halperin
Represented By
Jonathan David Cogan
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Sydney Sgambato Johnson
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Michael Joseph Cinnamon
Kobre & Kim LLP
contact info
Defendant
Erwin Marcelo Guarango-Marin
Defendant
Carlos Figueroa-Orellana
Defendant
Cristhian Orlando Montesdeoca Peralta
Represented By
Sanford Talkin
Talkin, Muccigrosso & Roberts LLP
contact info
Mark Muccigrosso
Talkin Muccigrosso And Roberts
contact info
Plaintiff
Urban D.C. Inc.
Represented By
Aaron Eitan Meyer
The Willis Law Group
contact info
William Clay
The Willis Law Group
contact info
Michael A Graves
The Willis Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Olivia Taylor Knott
The Willis Law Group
contact info
William J. Clay
The Willis Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Skyline Restoration Inc.
Represented By
Aaron Eitan Meyer
The Willis Law Group
contact info
William Clay
The Willis Law Group
contact info
Michael A Graves
The Willis Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Olivia Taylor Knott
The Willis Law Group
contact info
William J. Clay
The Willis Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Ionian Re, LLC
Represented By
Aaron Eitan Meyer
The Willis Law Group
contact info
William Clay
The Willis Law Group
contact info
Michael A Graves
The Willis Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Olivia Taylor Knott
The Willis Law Group
contact info
William J. Clay
The Willis Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
DNA Contracting & Waterproofing LLC
Represented By
Aaron Eitan Meyer
The Willis Law Group
contact info
William Clay
The Willis Law Group
contact info
Michael A Graves
The Willis Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Olivia Taylor Knott
The Willis Law Group
contact info
William J. Clay
The Willis Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
order Order(Other) Thu 05/01 1:07 PM
ORDER REFFERING54 -- The Motion at ECF No. 54 is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Ordered by Judge Diane Gujarati on 5/1/2025. (AD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
61 61 misc Letter Wed 04/30 3:47 PM
Letter Response to Docket Entry 54, Defendant Wilson Barrezueta Letter Motion for Premotion Conference by DNA Contracting & Waterproofing LLC, Ionian Re, LLC, Skyline Restoration Inc., Urban D.C. Inc. (Clay, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
60 60 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Eitan Meyer on behalf of DNA Contracting & Waterproofing LLC, Ionian Re, LLC, Skyline Restoration Inc., Urban D.C. Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Meyer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
59 59 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Graves on behalf of DNA Contracting & Waterproofing LLC, Ionian Re, LLC, Skyline Restoration Inc., Urban D.C. Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Graves, Michael)
Related: [-]
58 58 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Taylor Knott on behalf of DNA Contracting & Waterproofing LLC, Ionian Re, LLC, Skyline Restoration Inc., Urban D.C. Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Knott, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
57 57 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 5:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Taylor Knott on behalf of Ionian Re, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Knott, Olivia)
Related: [-]
56 56 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Eitan Meyer on behalf of Ionian Re, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Meyer, Aaron)
Related: [-]
55 55 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/28 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Graves on behalf of Ionian Re, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Graves, Michael)
Related: [-]