South Dakota District Court
Judge:Roberto A Lange
Case #: 4:24-cv-04214
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 2:57 AM CST
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
Defendant
Rice Lake West, Inc.
Represented By
Nathan R. Sellers
Fabyanske Westra Hart & Thomson, P.A.
contact info
Anna Mae Limoges
Halbach Szwarc Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Muth Electric, Inc
Represented By
Joshua I. Welle
Welle Law P.C.
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
City of Pierre
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Rice Lake West, Inc.
Represented By
Nathan R. Sellers
Fabyanske Westra Hart & Thomson, P.A.
contact info
Anna Mae Limoges
Halbach Szwarc Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
37 37 misc Certificate Thu 05/01 4:11 PM
CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service by Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc. (Moothart, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
36 36 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/14 11:10 AM
Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/10/2026, Motions due by 5/22/2026. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/14/2025. (MSB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
35 35 misc Discovery Report Fri 04/11 12:12 PM
Discovery Report Joint Rule 26(f) by Muth Electric, Inc.(Welle, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
34 34 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/28 4:17 PM
Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Fourth-Party Complaint by Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc.. (Moothart, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
33 33 3 pgs order Order for Discovery Report Tue 03/18 3:55 PM
ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 3/18/2025. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
32 32 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Mon 03/17 6:26 PM
ANSWER to 17 Third Party Complaint, by Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc.. (Moothart, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
31 31 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (attorney use) Fri 03/14 12:47 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Burns & McDonnell, Inc. for Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc.. (Moothart, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Noncompliance (Corporate Disclosure Statement) Thu 03/13 8:15 AM
NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE (Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed). D.S.D. Civ. L.R. 7.1.1 requires non-governmental organizational parties or intervenors to file either a Corporate Disclosure Statement or a Certificate that Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 is not applicable upon a party or intervenors first pleading or entry of appearance. Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc. has not complied. Said party has three business days to comply. Compliance may be achieved by docketing the statement or certificate in CM/ECF using the Corporate Disclosure Statement or Certificate of Non-Applicability event. (RRB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/12 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A. Moothart on behalf of Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc.. (Moothart, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
28 28 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 02/17 1:31 PM
MUTH ELECTRIC, INC.'S ANSWER to 25 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (AMENDED) OF RICE LAKE WEST, INC. by Muth Electric, Inc. (Welle, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
27 27 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/04 3:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Pierre. City of Pierre waiver sent on 2/4/2025, answer due 4/7/2025. (Tobin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
26 26 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 02/03 10:10 AM
RICE LAKE WEST, INC.'S ANSWER to 16 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim OF CITY OF PIERRE AGAINST RICE LAKE WEST by Rice Lake West, Inc.. (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 02/03 9:55 AM
RICE LAKE WEST, INC. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand AND , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Muth Electric, Inc by Rice Lake West, Inc.. (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
24 24 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (attorney use) Thu 01/23 9:57 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/23 9:33 AM
Amended ANSWER to 1 with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company. (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 01/17 3:16 PM
Rice Lake West Incs ANSWER to 1 with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Muth Electric, Inc by Rice Lake West, Inc.. (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/17 3:12 PM
Defendant Federal Insurance Companys ANSWER to 1 with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company. (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
20 20 service Summons Issued Tue 01/14 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: [LINK:National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (SKK)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Request for Issuance of Summons(es) Tue 01/14 9:24 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by City of Pierre. (Tobin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/13 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Derenge on behalf of City of Pierre. (Derenge, Kristin)
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Third Party Complaint Mon 01/13 4:35 PM
Fourth THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Burns & McDonnell Engineering Company, Inc. filed by City of Pierre. (Tobin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex A - Subcontractor's Complaint,
Att: 2 Ex B - Contractor's Third Party Complaint,
Att: 3 Ex C - City's Answer and Counterclaim
16 16 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Mon 01/13 4:17 PM
ANSWER to 7 Third Party Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Rice Lake West, Inc. by City of Pierre. (Tobin, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Mon 01/13 3:40 PM
ANSWER to 7 Third Party Complaint by City of Pierre. (Tobin, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/13 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Tobin on behalf of City of Pierre. (Tobin, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Filing Error Mon 01/13 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Filing Error:15 Answer to Third Party Complaint was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Tobin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
13 13 service Return of Service Executed Thu 12/26 10:07 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon ThirdParty Defendant City of Pierre on 12/23/2024 (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/05 12:57 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nathan R. Sellers for Rice Lake West, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/5/2024. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
11 11 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/04 1:38 PM
MOTION for Attorney Nathan R. Sellers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4422108) by Rice Lake West, Inc.. (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (attorney use) Wed 12/04 1:26 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Rice Lake West, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Water Resources Group, Inc. for Rice Lake West, Inc.. (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 12/02 3:12 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Pierre. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: [LINK:National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (SKK) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/2/2024) (SKK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
8 8 misc Request for Issuance of Summons(es) Wed 11/27 5:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Rice Lake West, Inc.. (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Third Party Complaint Wed 11/27 5:13 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Muth Electric, Inc filed by Rice Lake West, Inc.. (Limoges, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint
Friday, November 22, 2024
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (attorney use) Fri 11/22 4:58 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Muth Electric, Inc. (Welle, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/21 2:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Muth Electric, Inc. Federal Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/18/2024, answer due 1/17/2025. (Welle, Joshua)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/21 2:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Muth Electric, Inc. Rice Lake West, Inc. waiver sent on 11/18/2024, answer due 1/17/2025. (Welle, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Waiver of Service Thu 11/21 2:03 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Federal Insurance Company on 11/18/2024 by Muth Electric, Inc. (Welle, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Waiver of Service Thu 11/21 2:02 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Rice Lake West, Inc. on 11/18/2024 by Muth Electric, Inc. (Welle, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 11/15 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4409981, in shell case on 11/15/2024 filed by Muth Electric, Inc. (DJP)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 11/15 4:31 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: [LINK:National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (DJP)
Related: [-]