Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:24-cv-01411
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Case in other court:County Court at Law #2, C-1-CV-24-003816
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 3:52 AM CST
Defendant
Austin Independent School District
Represented By
Holly Gene McIntush
Thompson & Horton, LLP
contact info
Andrew Charles Tatgenhorst
Thompson & Horton
contact info
Plaintiff
Donna Betts
Represented By
S. Tomiyo Stoner
Undaunted Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/27 4:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Notice Concerning Reference to United States Magistrate Judge due by 4/25/2025, Jury Trial set for 3/23/2026 at 9:30 A.M. in Austin before Judge Robert Pitman, Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2025, Discovery due by 10/1/2025, and Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2025. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr)
Related: [-]
8 8 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 02/27 4:25 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Lane: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/27/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter WebEx.) Written Order Forthcoming. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
7 7 adr ADR Report Filed - Consent to Alternate Dispute Resolution Tue 02/25 9:37 PM
ADR Report Filed - CONSENT to Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) by Donna Betts(Stoner, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 02/11 9:06 AM
Order Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by Phone . Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2025 at 10:00 A.M. before Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
5 5 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Thu 01/23 5:33 PM
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order and Report of Rule 26(f) Conference by Donna Betts.(Stoner, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order - Scheduling Order
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
4 4 misc Supplement to Tue 11/19 1:32 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet by Austin Independent School District. (McIntush, Holly)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/19 10:18 AM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Deficiency Notice Tue 11/19 10:18 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Notice of Removal, the Notice of Removal you filed is deficient because the Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet is not attached. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the supplement using Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Supplement. This form is required for any Notice of Removal filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 11/15 5:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Austin Independent School District (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19476561), filed by Austin Independent School District.(McIntush, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Court Pleadings
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/19 10:15 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Tue 11/19 10:15 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Tue 11/19 10:16 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Donna Betts. (kp)
Related: [-]