Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Jodi W Dishman
Case #: 5:24-cv-01185
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 2:48 AM CST
Defendant
Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC
Represented By
Craig E Brown
Craig E. Brown, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Eric P Wallis
Represented By
Lysbeth L George
Law Office Of Liz George, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Oklahoma State of
Represented By
Jamie L Bloyd
Oklahoma Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Amanda R Johnson
Us Attorney'S Office-Okc
contact info
Ronald R Gallegos
Us Attorney'S Office-Okc
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 9:06 AM
ORDER granting33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ronald A. Margolis. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 04/03/2025. (cd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
33 33 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Tue 04/01 3:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC.(Brown, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice
32 32 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Tue 04/01 1:22 PM
STRICKEN MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4662791 by Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC.(Brown, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
notice Notice from the Court Tue 04/01 3:28 PM
NOTICE from the Court32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4662791, STRICKEN , due to counsel's failure to provide an exhibit number and description. Counsel to refile within 24 hours from this Notice. The filing should not differ in substance apart from addressing the deficiencies raised in this Notice. The $100.00 filing fee need not be paid a second time. (rp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
31 31 3 pgs order Order Thu 03/20 1:19 PM
ORDER granting28 JOINT MOTION for Federal Rule of Evidence 502 Clawback Order. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 03/20/2025. (cd)
Related: [-]
30 30 15 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 03/20 1:10 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting28 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 03/20/2025. (cd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
29 29 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/07 2:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to file a motion for a status conference if needed in the future or to indicate a conference is needed in the midway discovery joint status report required in paragraph 21. Motions in limine due 6/8/2026; Jury instructions due 6/8/2026; Voir dire requests due 6/8/2026; Discovery due by 3/6/2026. Motions due by 3/6/2026. Pretrial Report due by 6/8/2026. Jury Trial set for 7/14/2026 09:00 AM in Courtroom 502 before Judge Jodi W. Dishman. See Order for all deadlines, requirements, and details. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 03/07/2025. (cd)
Related: [-]
28 28 3 pgs motion Protective Order Fri 03/07 1:28 PM
JOINT MOTION for Protective Order and Federal Rule of Evidence 502 Clawback Order by United States of America. (Johnson, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
27 27 misc Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Tue 03/04 4:05 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff United States of America. (Johnson, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
26 26 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 01/31 8:12 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Karina Conley on behalf of Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC (Conley, Karina)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 01/31 6:55 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Richard H Blake on behalf of Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC (Blake, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/30 10:44 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Karina R. Conley and granting22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard H. Blake. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 01/30/2025. (nv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
23 23 misc Docket Tue 01/28 9:14 AM
NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL . The Court ORDERS counsel to file the Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan (now a single document) by March 4, 2025. Counsel and the parties are directed to read this Notice in its entirety. (nv)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Tue 01/28 8:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4616551 by Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC.(Brown, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney) Tue 01/28 7:56 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4616541 by Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC.(Brown, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Request for Admission
Monday, January 27, 2025
20 20 27 pgs answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Mon 01/27 1:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC.(Brown, Craig)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Mon 01/27 11:44 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Eric P Wallis.(George, Lysbeth)
Related: [-]
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 01/27 10:21 AM
ORDER denying17 Motion for Extension of Time to File without prejudice to resubmission. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 01/27/2025. (cd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/23 1:09 PM
SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time by Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC. (Brown, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/27 2:47 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court extends the deadline for Defendant Eric P. Wallis, Ph.D. to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to January 27, 2025. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 12/27/24. (rp)
Related: [-]
15 15 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/27 11:50 AM
SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Eric P Wallis. (George, Lysbeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/12 9:47 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court extends the deadline for Defendant Eric P. Wallis, Ph.D. to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to December 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 12/12/2024. (nv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/11 4:33 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Eric P Wallis. (George, Lysbeth)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs notice Entry of Appearance Wed 12/11 4:31 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Lysbeth L George on behalf of Eric P Wallis (George, Lysbeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/10 3:07 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC. The Court extends the deadline for Defendant Coordinated Care Health Solutions, LLC to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to January 27, 2025. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 12/10/2024. (nv)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/10 1:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC. (Brown, Craig)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs misc Disclosure Statement - LLC Tue 12/10 12:57 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC . (Brown, Craig)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 12/10 11:30 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Craig E Brown on behalf of Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC (Brown, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
7 7 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 12/06 10:55 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jamie L Bloyd on behalf of Oklahoma State of (Bloyd, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/26 2:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Eric P Wallis served on 11/21/2024.(Johnson, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Green card,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Summons
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/26 2:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC served on 11/20/2024.(Johnson, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit 1-Green card,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit 2-Summons
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
4 4 4 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 11/19 2:44 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC, Eric P Wallis. (rp)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 11/18 12:46 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda R Johnson on behalf of United States of America (Johnson, Amanda)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 11/18 12:33 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald R Gallegos on behalf of United States of America (Gallegos, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/15 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Coordinated Care Health Solutions LLC, Eric P Wallis filed by Oklahoma State of, United States of America.(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet