Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:24-cv-01353
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 5:53 AM CDT
Defendant
Donald S. Haynes
Represented By
Andrew N. Grams
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Joseph Fiorile
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Christopher W. Lea
Represented By
Andrew N. Grams
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Joseph Fiorile
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Randolph R. Nash
Represented By
Andrew N. Grams
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Joseph Fiorile
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Wendell J. Naylor
Represented By
Andrew N. Grams
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Joseph Fiorile
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Scottie Poarch
Represented By
Andrew N. Grams
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Joseph Fiorile
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Pamela Stephens
Represented By
Andrew N. Grams
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Joseph Fiorile
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Timothy W. Wheeler
Represented By
Andrew N. Grams
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Joseph Fiorile
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Reid Van Ness
Represented By
James D.R. Roberts, Jr.
Roberts & Associates
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Carter Lawrence
Terminated: 05/05/2025
Represented By
Andrew N. Grams
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Joseph Fiorile
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Skrmetti
Terminated: 05/05/2025
Represented By
Andrew N. Grams
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Joseph Fiorile
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info

GPO May 05 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 05/05/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
72 72 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/09 1:24 PM
ORDER: Based upon the parties filings (Doc. Nos.65 and68 ), it appears that six witnesses may testify at the preliminary injunction hearing set for Thursday, May 15, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. Therefore, the hearing is reset to 10:00 a.m. The parties shall deliver to chambers by noon on May 12, 2025, four separately bound copies of the exhibits in Doc. No. 70. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 05/09/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
71 71 misc Supplement Thu 05/08 8:05 PM
SUPPLEMENT filed by Donald S. Haynes, Christopher W. Lea, Randolph R. Nash, Wendell J. Naylor, Scottie Poarch, Pamela Stephens, Timothy W. Wheeler re58 Motion to Amend/Correct,.(Fiorile, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit January 2025 Board Minutes
70 70 misc Stipulation Thu 05/08 6:56 PM
STIPULATION of Admissibility of Exhibits by Donald S. Haynes, Carter Lawrence, Christopher W. Lea, Randolph R. Nash, Wendell J. Naylor, Scottie Poarch, Jonathan Skrmetti, Pamela Stephens, Timothy W. Wheeler. (Grams, Andrew)
Related: [-]
69 69 notice Notice of Filing Thu 05/08 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Reid Van Ness(Roberts, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Robert Gribble Deposition
68 68 trial Witness List Thu 05/08 6:02 PM
Witness List and Exhibit List by Reid Van Ness. (Roberts, James)
Related: [-]
67 67 misc Stipulation Thu 05/08 4:11 PM
STIPULATION for Attorney to Testify by Deposition by Donald S. Haynes, Carter Lawrence, Christopher W. Lea, Randolph R. Nash, Wendell J. Naylor, Scottie Poarch, Jonathan Skrmetti, Pamela Stephens, Timothy W. Wheeler. (Grams, Andrew)
Related: [-]
66 66 misc Joint Case Resolution Status Report Thu 05/08 4:10 PM
Joint Case Resolution Status Report by Donald S. Haynes, Christopher W. Lea, Randolph R. Nash, Wendell J. Naylor, Scottie Poarch, Pamela Stephens, Timothy W. Wheeler. (Grams, Andrew)
Related: [-]
65 65 trial Exhibit List Thu 05/08 4:07 PM
Exhibit List & Witness List by Donald S. Haynes, Christopher W. Lea, Randolph R. Nash, Wendell J. Naylor, Scottie Poarch, Pamela Stephens, Timothy W. Wheeler.. (Grams, Andrew)
Related: [-]
64 64 notice Notice of Filing Thu 05/08 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Donald S. Haynes, Carter Lawrence, Christopher W. Lea, Randolph R. Nash, Wendell J. Naylor, Scottie Poarch, Jonathan Skrmetti, Pamela Stephens, Timothy W. Wheeler(Grams, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Transcript of Reid VanNess
Monday, May 05, 2025
63 63 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 05/06 9:08 AM
ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying62 Memorandum Opinion, the Court rules as follows: Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No.39 ) is GRANTED IN PART as to Van Ness's claims against Defendant Jonathan Skrmetti and Van Ness's requests for compensatory damages against all Defendants and is DENIED IN PART in all other respects. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 21, Van Nesss claims against Defendant Carter Lawrence and his requests for equitable relief for injuries to third parties are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 05/05/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
62 62 28 pgs order Memorandum Opinion of the Court Tue 05/06 9:05 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 05/05/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
61 61 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 05/05 1:44 PM
ORDER: The hearing to consider Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction set for May 15, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. is RESET to 1:00 p.m. on May 15, 2025. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 5/5/2025. (kc)
Related: [-]