Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-10809
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 12:47 AM MST
Defendant
Francisco Javier Cantu-Ramirez (1)
Represented By
Timothy Davis Rogers
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/16/2024 2:13 AM MST
Monday, November 11, 2024
Arrest of Francisco Javier Cantu-Ramirez on 11/11/2024. (CXE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Francisco Javier Cantu-Ramirez. (CXE)
Related: [-]