Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00233
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 1:20 AM CST
Defendant
Raymundo Duran Baza (1)
Represented By
Michelle Allen-McCoy
Federal Defender'S Office - Frisco
contact info
Defendant
Isaac Martinez (2)
Represented By
Rafael De La Garza, II
The De La Garza Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Maureen E Smith
U. S. Attorney'S Office-Sherman
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/16/2024 2:23 AM CST
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Isaac Martinez (1). (xl) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Raymundo Duran Baza (1). (rpc) (rpc). [4:24-mj-00632-BD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/5/2024) Affidavit/Declaration
2 2 Sealed Document - Affidavit as to Isaac Martinez. (xl) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
2 2 E-GOV SEALED Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis in case as to Raymundo Duran Baza. (rpc) [4:24-mj-00632-BD]
Related: [-]
3 3 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Isaac Martinez. (xl) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
4 4 E-GOV SEALED Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis in case as to Isaac Martinez. (xl) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
Arrest of Isaac Martinez (AEJ) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Isaac Martinez: Initial Appearance set for 11/8/2024 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. (AEJ) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Isaac Martinez (AEJ) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Raymundo Duran Baza (AEJ) [4:24-mj-00632-BD]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Raymundo Duran Baza: Initial Appearance set for 11/8/2024 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. (AEJ) [4:24-mj-00632-BD]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Raymundo Duran Baza (AEJ) [4:24-mj-00632-BD]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis: Initial Appearance as to Isaac Martinez held on 11/8/2024 from 11:41 - 12:07, Attorney Rafael De La Garza, II, standing by and appointed for Isaac Martinez. (Prelim/ Detention Hearing set for 11/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis.. Dft Location: Custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Lesley Brooks; Defense - Rafael de La Garza. No exhibits. (Court Reporter - Digital Recording) (dm) [4:24-mj-00633-BD] (Entered: 11/08/2024)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Isaac Martinez. (dm) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis: Initial Appearance as to Raymundo Duran Baza held on 11/8/2024 from 11:41 - 12:07, FPD attorney Michelle Allen-McCoy standing by and appointed for Raymundo Duran Baza. (Preliminary/ Detention Hearing set for 11/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. Dft Location: Custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Lesley Brooks; Defense - Michelle Allen-McCoy. No exhibits. (Court Reporter - Digital Recording) (dm) [4:24-mj-00632-BD] (Entered: 11/08/2024)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Raymundo Duran Baza. (dm) [4:24-mj-00632-BD]
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Raymundo Duran Baza (rpc) [4:24-mj-00632-BD]
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Isaac Martinez (jmb) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Raymundo Duran Baza. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 11/8/2024. (rpc) [4:24-mj-00632-BD]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 20/Order Appointing Attorney as to Isaac Martinez: Appointment of Attorney Rafael De La Garza, II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 11/8/2024. (jmb) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
6 6 RULE 5(f)(1) ORDER as to Raymundo Duran Baza. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 11/8/2024. (rpc) [4:24-mj-00632-BD]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 5(f)(1) ORDER as to Isaac Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 11/8/2024. (jmb) [4:24-mj-00633-BD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Raymundo Duran Baza: Detention/Preliminary Examination set for 11/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Bill Davis. (AEJ) [4:24-mj-00632-BD]
Related: [-]
9 9 INDICTMENT (Merged MJ complaint case: 4:24MJ632, 4:24MJ633.) as to Raymundo Duran Baza (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, Isaac Martinez (2) count(s) 1, 2-3. (jmb)
Related: [-]
10 10 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Raymundo Duran Baza (jmb)
Related: [-]
11 11 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Isaac Martinez (jmb)
Related: [-]