USA v. Miranda-Aguirre
California Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 3:24-cr-02428 |
Case Filed: | Nov 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2024 11:24 PM PST |
Defendant
Auran Miranda-Aguirre (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/16/2024 12:32 AM PST |
Saturday, October 19, 2024 | ||
Arrest of Auran Miranda-Aguirre (no document attached) (vyc) [2:24-mj-08915-LR] | ||
Monday, October 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Auran Miranda-Aguirre (no document attached) (cxl) [2:24-mj-08915-LR] | |
3 | 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Auran Miranda-Aguirre held on 10/21/2024. Proffer, Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Auran Miranda-Aguirre. USA's oral motion to detain, Detention Hearing as to Auran Miranda-Aguirre held on 10/21/2024. USA oral motion for detention; motion granted as to Auran Miranda-Aguirre. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA by 5pm on 10/22/2024. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/31/2024 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Arraignment set for 11/14/2024 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 10/21/2024 LR2024 2:36-2:54). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez). (Defendant Attorney Bacilio Varela). (cxl) [2:24-mj-08915-LR] | |
Tuesday, October 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Auran Miranda-Aguirre. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 11/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. (Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 10/31/2024 LR 24: 10:21- 10:24). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson, FD S/A). (aum) [2:24-mj-08915-LR] | |
Thursday, November 14, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
9 | 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Arraignment on Indictment as to Auran Miranda-Aguirre (1) Count 1 held on 11/14/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 12/16/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Linda Lopez. (Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 11/14/2024 LR 24: 10:33 - 10:37). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Jo Anne Tyrell FD, S/A). (ave) |