California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-04040
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 15, 2024 11:27 PM PST
Defendant
Jose Angel Meza-Gallego (1)
Represented By
Jesus Mosqueda
Federal Defenders
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Pablo Emanuel Pineda-Cuenca
Represented By
Christian M. Ham
Law Offices Of Christian M Ham
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Daniel F. Casillas
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/16/2024 12:38 AM PST
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
Arrest of Jose Angel Meza-Gallego (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Angel Meza-Gallego.(fjp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order by Judge Leshner: Material Witness Attorney Christian M. Ham for Pablo Emanuel Pineda-Cuenca appointed.Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jose Angel Meza-Gallego: Initial Appearance set for 11/14/2024 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Daniel F. Casillas appearing for USA. (Casillas, Daniel)Attorney Daniel F. Casillas added to party USA(pty:pla) (yxc).
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner: Status Hearing re Initial Apperance as to Jose Angel Meza-Gallego held on 11/14/2024. Defendant not present. The Court provisionally appoints federal defenders. Material witness counsel, Christian Ham is confirmed. he Court continues the Initial Appearance set for 11/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. (CD# 11/14/2024 DDL 24: 4:07-4:08). (Plaintiff Attorney Alex Biggs, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Julian Bugarin, FD). (no document attached) (dxj)
Related: [-]