Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:24-mj-06537
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Terminated:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 2:30 AM EST
Defendant
Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (1)
Represented By
Alfredo Robert Zamora
The Zamora Law Firm LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Justin W. McCormack
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/18/2024 10:57 AM EST
Thursday, November 14, 2024
1 1 10 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (1). (ar2)
Related: [-]
2 2 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer. Initial Appearance set for 11/14/2024 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (ar2)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alfredo Robert Zamora appearing for Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (Zamora, Alfredo)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Initial Appearance as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer held on 11/14/2024. Stipulated bond set: Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (1) $250,000 CSB with Nebbia. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 11/14/2024.. Arraignment set for 12/5/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 12/5/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 12/5/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 11:53:02/12:20:22) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/14/2024. (smy) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/14/2024) (rbe).
Related: [-]
5 5 (Stricken Per DE 7 ) ORAL MOTION to Appoint Private Counsel by Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer. (smy) Modified on 11/14/2024 (rbe).
Related: [-]
6 6 (Stricken Per DE 7 ) PAPERLESS ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appoint Private Counsel as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/14/2024. (smy) Modified on 11/14/2024 (rbe).
Related: [-]
7 7 PAPERLESS ORDER Striking as to Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer re 6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Alejandro Rafael Figueroa Ferrer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 11/14/2024. (rbe)
Related: [-]