Texas Western District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00322
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 1:23 AM CST
Defendant
Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez (1)
Represented By
Jaime Escuder - FPD
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kevin Cayton
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Dec 18 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1)
GPO Jan 06 2025
ORDER accepting re 23 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Judge David Counts. (vs3)

Docket last updated: 11/16/2024 2:27 AM CST
Sunday, October 20, 2024
Arrest of Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez (jh1) [4:24-mj-00492-DF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00492-DF]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge David B. Fannin as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00492-DF]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Initial Appearance as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez held on 10/22/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 10/25/2024 01:00 PM in Pecos before Judge David B. Fannin,), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez, Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez (Court Reporter FTR-ALPINE.) (jh1) [4:24-mj-00492-DF]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Jaime Escuder - FPD for Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00492-DF]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00492-DF]
Related: [-]
5 5 Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00492-DF]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00492-DF]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Preliminary Hearing as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez held on 10/25/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Detention Hearing as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez held on 10/25/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez (Court Reporter FTR-PECOS.) (jh1) [4:24-mj-00492-DF]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Bond set to No Bond as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez (1). Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00492-DF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
All parties shall comply with the[LINK:Standing Orders] for the Pecos Division. Parties can review the standing orders by clicking the included hyperlink as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez (bot2)
Related: [-]
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
10 10 Waiver of personal appearance at Arraignment, plea of not guilty by Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez (Escuder - FPD, Jaime)
Related: [-]
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Marcos Gonzalez-Hernandez (bot1)
Related: [-]