Texas Western District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00326
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 16, 2024 1:24 AM CST
Defendant
Roman Villanueva (1)
Represented By
Raymond Keith Fivecoat
Fivecoat Law, P.C.
contact info
Sandra Lynne Stewart
Sandy Stewart, Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kevin Cayton
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Dec 18 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Roman Villanueva. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (vs3)
GPO Jan 06 2025
ORDER accepting re 22 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Roman Villanueva. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Judge David Counts. (vs3)

Docket last updated: 11/16/2024 2:30 AM CST
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
Arrest of Roman Villanueva (jh1) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Roman Villanueva by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
Attorney Sandra Lynne Stewart terminated as to Roman Villanueva., Attorney Raymond Keith Fivecoat for Roman Villanueva added (vs3) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge David B. Fannin as to Roman Villanueva. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David B. Fannin:Initial Appearance as to Roman Villanueva held on 10/11/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 10/21/2024 09:30 AM in Alpine before Judge David B. Fannin,), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Roman Villanueva, Oral Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Roman Villanueva (Court Reporter FTR-ALPINE.) (jh1) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Sandra Lynne Stewart for Roman Villanueva appointed. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Roman Villanueva. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
5 5 Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Roman Villanueva. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Roman Villanueva. (jh1) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER WITHDRAWING COUNSEL AND ORDER APPOINTING NEW COUNSEL as to Roman Villanueva. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (vs3) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
8 8 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Roman Villanueva (Fivecoat, Raymond) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Roman Villanueva. Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (r013) [4:24-mj-00479-DF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
All parties shall comply with the[LINK:Standing Orders] for the Pecos Division. Parties can review the standing orders by clicking the included hyperlink as to Roman Villanueva (bot2)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMENT Related [+] with Notice of Forfeiture included as to Roman Villanueva. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Roman Villanueva (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Roman Villanueva (bot1)
Related: [-]