Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00602
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2024
Terminated:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 1:50 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Victoria Aranda
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Asst United States Attorney Br-Mag Duty
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Josue Tomas Ramirez-Saucedo (1)
Terminated: 11/13/2024
Represented By
Rene E De Coss
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Roberto Gomez Jimenez
Terminated: 11/13/2024
Material Witness
Katheryn Rubiano-Acosta
Terminated: 11/13/2024


Docket last updated: 11/18/2024 2:54 AM CST
Friday, October 18, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Josue Tomas Ramirez-Saucedo (1), filed. (dlr1)
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Josue Tomas Ramirez-Saucedo, arrested on 10/17/2024, filed. (dlr1) (dlr1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/18/2024) Unredacted attachment
3 3 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Roberto Gomez Jimenez, Katheryn Rubiano-Acosta as to Josue Tomas Ramirez-Saucedo, filed. (dlr1)
Related: [-]