Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:24-cv-06153
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 02, 2025 4:09 AM EST
Defendant
CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA
Represented By
ROBERT M. RUNYON, III
Horst, Krekstein & Runyon
contact info
Patrick Clawson
Horst Krekstein & Runyon LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LEHIGH VALLEY TOXICOLOGY, LLC
Represented By
JOHN J. MULDOWNEY
Hill Wallack LLP
contact info
PAUL R. SHEEHAN
Hill Wallack LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
25 25 motion Leave to File Document Mon 05/05 4:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA.Brief, Certificate of Service.(RUNYON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, April 28, 2025
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/28 2:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA.(RUNYON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/28 12:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by LEHIGH VALLEY TOXICOLOGY, LLC.(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 28, 2025
22 22 24 pgs motion Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 03/28 3:35 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by LEHIGH VALLEY TOXICOLOGY, LLC..(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 03/28 1:27 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA..(RUNYON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Wed 03/26 12:15 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS (ECF NOS.18 ,19 ) ARE GRANTED AND THE PARTIES ARE PERMITTED TO SUBMIT THEIR RESPECTIVE BRIEFS IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS WITH A MAXIMUM OF THIRTY (30) PAGES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 3/25/25.3/25/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 motion File Excess Pages Mon 03/24 9:49 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by LEHIGH VALLEY TOXICOLOGY, LLC..(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/21 3:01 PM
MOTION Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Opening Briefs filed by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA.Certificate of Service.(RUNYON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/31 8:35 AM
ORDER THAT ALL MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS SHALL BE FILED BY MARCH 28, 2025. RESPONSES SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN APRIL 28, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 1/31/25. 1/31/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 01/28 12:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER: In Person Pretrial Conference held on 1/28/25. Court Reporter: None. (er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 01/14 10:32 AM
AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing that the Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been rescheduled as follows: 1. The Rule 16 Conference in the above-captioned matter in Chambers before Judge John M. Gallagher on Tuesday, January 21, 2025 at 11:00 AM, (ECF No.13 ) is Amended. 2. Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, January 28, 2025 at 11:00 AM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
14 14 10 pgs discov Discovery Plan Mon 01/13 5:16 PM
Discovery Plan by LEHIGH VALLEY TOXICOLOGY, LLC.(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 12/17 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Hearing that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows: Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Tuesday, January 21, 2025 at 11:00 AM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. Counsel are required to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and to complete and submit to the Court the Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than Monday, January 13, 2025. The Parties are advised that the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this Court is the Honorable Pamela A. Carlos. (mas)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/17 12:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA.(RUNYON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Package Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Umbrella Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 5/24/24 Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 10/18/24 Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Laboratory Services Agreement LVG and CC
Thursday, December 05, 2024
11 11 1 pgs discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 12/05 4:28 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA.(RUNYON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs discov Disclosure of Citizenship Thu 12/05 4:23 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA . (RUNYON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Thu 12/05 9:09 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Christopher Rodriguez re: served Summons, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment upon Kris Bulian, Senior Paralegal on behalf of Continental Casualty Company/CNA by Authorized to Accept on 11/26/2024 (MULDOWNEY, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/27 4:27 PM
ORDER OF 11/27/24 THAT CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA IS HEREBY ORDERED TO FILE ITS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDG: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/27/24. 11/27/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
7 7 1 pgs discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 11/26 4:28 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Divided Sky Holdings LLC with Certificate of Service by LEHIGH VALLEY TOXICOLOGY, LLC.(SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 25, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/25 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Clawson on behalf of CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA with Certificate of Service(Clawson, Patrick)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/25 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT M. RUNYON, III on behalf of CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA with Certificate of Service(RUNYON, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/19 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL R. SHEEHAN on behalf of LEHIGH VALLEY TOXICOLOGY, LLC (SHEEHAN, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/18 2:15 PM
ORDER THAT LEHIGH VALLEY TOXICOLOGY, LLC D/B/A LEHIGH VALLEY GENOMICS, LLC, IS TO FILE ITS DISCLOSURE STATEMENT2 WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THIS ORDER ALSO SERVES AS A REMINDER TO THE PARTIES OF THEIR CONTINUING OBLIGATION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(B)(2) TO PROMPTLY FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF ANY CHANGES TO THE INFORMATION REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(A). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 11/18/24. 11/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 11/18 12:49 PM
Summons Issued as to CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY/CNA. Forwarded To: Counsel on November 18, 2024. (dt)
Related: [-]
1 1 47 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 11/18 9:06 AM
COMPLAINT against CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY (CNA) ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17885681.), filed by LEHIGH VALLEY TOXICOLOGY, LLC d/b/a LEHIGH VALLEY GENOMICS.(MULDOWNEY, JOHN)
Related: [-]