Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:24-cv-12859
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 6:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Boston Police Headquarter
Plaintiff
Keon L. Boggs
112 Southampton Street
Boston, MA 02118


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
6 6 misc Copy Mailed Thu 02/06 12:39 PM
Copy re4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,5 Order Dismissing Case mailed to Keon L. Boggs on 2/6/2025. (MAC)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/06 11:42 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE (MAC)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/06 11:13 AM
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered: 1. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2. This action is DISMISSED as frivolous and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Plaintiff is WARNED that, should he continue to file frivolous actions, he could be subject to sanctions, including restrictions on his ability to bring lawsuits in this court. Judicial resources are limited and should not be diverted to addressing frivolous filings. As the Supreme Court has explained, ?every paper filed [with the court], no matter how repetitious or frivolous, requires some portion of the institution?s limited resources.? In re McDonald, 489 U.S. 180, 184 (1989) (per curiam). The court has a ?responsibility to see that these resources are allocated in a way that promotes the interests of justice.? Id. The ?continual processing? of ?repetitious or frivolous? filings ?does not promote that end.? Id. ?Federal courts possess discretionary powers to regulate the conduct of abusive litigants? and ?[t]his includes the ability to enjoin a party?even a pro se party?from filing frivolous and vexatious motions.? United States v. Gomez-Rosario, 418 F.3d 90, 101 (1st Cir. 2005). See also Childs v. Miller, 713 F.3d 1262, 1265 (10th Cir. 2013) (?When a pro se litigant files complaints that are repetitive, duplicative of other filings, without merit, or frivolous, he abuses the district court process.?); Conway v. Nusbaum, 109 Fed. App?x 42, 44 (6th Cir. 2004) (?[T]he court may impose prefiling restrictions on an individual with a history of repetitive or vexatious litigation.?). The Court CERTIFIES that any appeal of this order would not be taken in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) (?An appeal may not be taken in forma pauperis if the trial court certifies in writing that it is not taken in good faith.?). So Ordered. (MAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 11/19 8:12 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Martin, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 11/18 11:42 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keon L. Boggs.(Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/18 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Boston Police Headquarter, filed by Keon L. Boggs.(Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form