North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-00163
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 02, 2025 4:40 AM EST
Defendant
MrBeastYouTube, LLC
Plaintiff
Brittany Carter
Represented By
Joseph Douglas Budd
Osborn Gambale Beckley & Budd PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Tue 04/01 2:43 PM
ORDER Appointing Mediator - Kenneth P. Carlson, Jr. appointed. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/1/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
17 17 adr Selection of Mediator Tue 04/01 9:20 AM
Selection of Kenneth P. Carlson, Jr. as mediator filed by MrBeastYouTube, LLC. (Pinson, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/18 2:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/31/2025. Motions due by 1/30/2026. The matter will be set for trial by separate order. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/18/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Form
adr Notice to Counsel - Selection of Mediator Tue 03/18 3:02 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Selection of Mediator form are available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. The Selection of Mediator form must be electronically filed on or before 4/8/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 03/05 2:28 PM
STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 3/5/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
14 14 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Mon 03/03 10:04 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by MrBeastYouTube, LLC. Amendment to13 Order,, Set Deadlines, Regarding the Corrected Proposed Protective Order (Pinson, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 02/24 3:45 PM
ORDER regarding11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material . The parties shall correct the deficiency and refile only the proposed protective order within seven (7) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/24/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Fri 02/21 3:49 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.:11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material . Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/21/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Thu 02/20 9:36 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material . (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
11 11 motion Protective Order Wed 02/19 10:37 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material filed by MrBeastYouTube, LLC. (Pinson, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stipulated Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material
10 10 discov Rule 26(f) Report (joint) Wed 02/19 10:23 AM
Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by MrBeastYouTube, LLC. (Pinson, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 3:20 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Meredith A. Pinson on behalf of MrBeastYouTube, LLC. (Pinson, Meredith)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs discov Order for Discovery Plan Tue 01/21 11:36 AM
ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/21/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
7 7 2 pgs misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 01/20 12:01 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by MrBeastYouTube, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Beast Industries, Co. for MrBeastYouTube, LLC. (Pinson, Meredith)
Related: [-]
6 6 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/20 11:57 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by MrBeastYouTube, LLC. (Pinson, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
utility Case Selected for Mediation Mon 12/30 11:05 AM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Selection of Mediator form are available on the court's Website,[LINK:www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx] . Please serve this list on all parties. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
5 5 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 11/21 5:14 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Brittany Carter. MrBeastYouTube, LLC waiver sent on 11/21/2024, answer due 1/20/2025. (Budd, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 11/19 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to MrBeastYouTube, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 11/19 8:51 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Brittany Carter (Budd, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/19 8:49 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Douglas Budd on behalf of Brittany Carter. (Budd, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 8:45 AM
COMPLAINT against MrBeastYouTube, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7856082.), filed by Brittany Carter. (Budd, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons