Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:24-bk-12634
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Dormify, Inc.
P.O. Box 170376
Brooklyn, NY 11217
Represented By
Harley J. Goldstein
Goldstein & Mcclintock
contact info
Ainsley G. Moloney
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Joshua M. Grenard
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
William H. Thomas
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Maria Aprile Sawczuk
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 8:26 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
Cred. Comm. Chair
Jonathan Y Designs Inc
185 Madison Avenue 17th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Cred. Comm. Chair
New Sega Home Textiles North America, Inc.
138 Main Street Suite 302
East Rockaway, NY 11518
Cred. Comm. Chair
Simply Sisters Greek
3430 FM 2446
Franklin, TX 77856
Creditor
Google LLC
600 N. King Street, Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Michael Ingrassia
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Creditor
Shenandoah Framing, Inc.
Represented By
Bradford F Englander
Whiteford Taylor & Preston LLP
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
Creditor
Rithum Corporation
2005 Market Street, Suite 2600
Philadelphia, PA 19103
Represented By
Daniel Michael Pereira
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Karen Zuckerman
Represented By
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Creditor
Jerome Zuckerman
Represented By
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Creditor
Amanda Zuckerman
Represented By
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John Kendrick Turner 3500 Maple Avenue Suite 800
Dallas, TX 75219
Represented By
John Kendrick Turner
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
R. Stephen McNeill
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Maria Kotsiras
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Andrew Ehrmann
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Interested Party
Standvast Fulfillment, LLC
Represented By
Roxanne M. Eastes
contact info
Stuart M. Brown
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
C. Kevin Kobbe
contact info
Interested Party
Clerisy Global Fund I, L.P., Natureza Opportunity Fund I, L.P., and Sixth Avenue Partners
Represented By
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Bayard P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Ameziel, Inc.
Represented By
Eric Castro
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Jonathan Lipshie
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
245 245 claims Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 2:22 PM
Certificate of Mailing . Filed by Reliable Companies. Related [+] (Matthews, Gene)
Related: [-] 242
244 244 claims Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 2:21 PM
Certificate of Mailing . Filed by Reliable Companies. Related [+] (Matthews, Gene)
Related: [-] 239 ,240
243 243 claims Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 2:20 PM
Certificate of Mailing . Filed by Reliable Companies. Related [+] (Matthews, Gene)
Related: [-] 234 ,235
242 242 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Thu 05/08 10:32 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Dormify, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/12/2025 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/10/2025. (Harburg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
241 241 order Shorten Time Thu 05/08 10:13 AM
Order Shortening Notice Period in Connection with Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Enforcing the Automatic Stay and (II) for Sanctions Against Google, LLC pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 362(k) Related [+] Order Signed on 5/8/2025. (DRG)
Related: [-] 240
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
240 240 7 pgs motion Shorten - Motion Wed 05/07 8:03 PM
Motion to Shorten Motion for Notice Period in Connection with Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Enforcing the Automatic Stay and (II) for Sanctions Against Google, LLC pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 362(k) Filed by Dormify, Inc.. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
239 239 10 pgs motion Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay - Motion Wed 05/07 8:02 PM
Motion For Sanctions for Violation of the Automatic Stay / Motion for Entry of an Order Shortening Notice Period in Connection with Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Enforcing the Automatic Stay and (II) for Sanctions Against Google, LLC pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 362(k) Filed by Dormify, Inc.. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 46 pgs Exhibit 3
238 238 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/07 3:38 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of James C. Vandermark Related [+] Order Signed on 5/7/2025. (LJH)
Related: [-] 236
237 237 13 pgs answer Objection Wed 05/07 3:17 PM
Objection of Google LLC to the Debtor's Order (I) Approving the Debtors (A) Sale of Intellectual Property Assets and Certain Related Assets to Williams-Sonoma, Inc. Free and Clear of all Encumbrances Other than Assumed Liabilities; and (B) Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to Williams Sonoma, Inc.; and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Google LLC (Ingrassia, Michael)
Related: [-] 230
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
236 236 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Wed 05/07 2:42 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for James C. Vandermark . Receipt Number 4681107, Filed by Google LLC. (Ingrassia, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
235 235 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/02 10:59 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Dormify, Inc.. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments
234 234 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/02 9:52 AM
Amended Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 Related [+] Filed by Dormify, Inc.. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-] 194
Att: 1 Attachments
233 233 misc Transcript Fri 05/02 9:20 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/28/25 RE: Motion for Approving Bidding Procedures. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/31/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Filed by Dormify, Inc. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/9/2025. Redaction Request Due By 5/23/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/2/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/31/2025. (JC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
232 232 claims Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 8:48 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Filed by Reliable Companies. Related [+] (Matthews, Gene)
Related: [-] 230
231 231 claims Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 8:47 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Filed by Reliable Companies. Related [+] (Matthews, Gene)
Related: [-] 226