Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Stephen R Bough
Case #: 2:24-cv-04205
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Terminated:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 6:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Marco Rubio
in his official capacity as Secretary of State 284 Russell Senate Office Building
Washington, DC 20510
Represented By
Joshua Clayton McCroskey
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Rana Jahani
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaveh Hooshmandi
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kenneth Platek
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Joshua Clayton McCroskey
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Daniel P. Callahan
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Joshua Clayton McCroskey
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Antony J. Blinken
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Joshua Clayton McCroskey
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Masoud Rahimi
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Hedieh Yoonesi
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ali Soltaninejad
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Parisa Sheikhi Karizaki
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alireza Safarkhani
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mohammad Naser Sadeghi
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Danial Rezaei
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mohammadamin Rami
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mohammad Pirhayati
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarasadat Nabavizadeh
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Zahra Khoobkar
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mahsa Hamedani
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sara Gohari
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mona Eskandari
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Saba Bahrami
Terminated: 02/03/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mohammad Reza Babaei Mosleh
Terminated: 03/27/2025
Represented By
Abadir Jama Barre
Barre Law, LLC
contact info
Curtis L Morrison
Red Eagle Law L.C.
contact info
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
25 25 order Order Thu 04/03 3:52 PM
Before the Court is Plaintiffs Rana Jahani and Kaveh Hooshmandi's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Doc. #24 .) Upon review, the dismissal is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed on 4/3/2025 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Thu 04/03 10:20 AM
Case electronically transferred to District of District of Columbia. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/31 11:32 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Rana Jahani, Kaveh Hooshmandi (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
23 23 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Sever Order on Motion to Dismiss Party Thu 03/27 11:57 AM
Before the Court is United States Secretary of State, Defendant Marco Rubio, and the Acting Director of the National Vetting Center, Defendant Kenneth Platek (collectively "Defendants") Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. #17 .) For the reasons stated in the order, the Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED in so far as: (1) Count III is DISMISSED; (2) All claims against Acting Director of the National Vetting Center, Defendant Kenneth Platek are DISMISSED; and (3) All Plaintiffs other than Plaintiff Rana Jahani and Plaintiff Keveh Hooshmandi are severed. The severed cases are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed on 3/27/2025 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/11 9:29 AM
Before the court is the parties' joint motion to appear remotely (Doc. #21 ). For good cause stated, the motion is GRANTED. The parties may appear remotely for the scheduling conference. Teleconference call-in number will be provided to the parties' counsel by via email. Signed on 3/11/2025 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
21 21 motion Order Mon 03/10 3:02 PM
Joint MOTION for order parties jointly request the Court grant leave for them to appear telephonically at the scheduling conference. re15 Rule 16 Notice, filed by Curtis Lee Morrison on behalf of Rana Jahani. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/24/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
20 20 respm Reply Suggestions to Motion Tue 03/04 6:49 PM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to sever nonresident Plaintiffs MOTION to dismiss party nonresident Plaintiffs for improper venue filed by Joshua Clayton McCroskey on behalf of Defendants Antony J. Blinken, Daniel P. Callahan. Related [+] (McCroskey, Joshua)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
19 19 adr Designation of Neutral - Mediation and Assessment Program Wed 02/26 6:38 PM
DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL (McCroskey, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
18 18 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/18 10:03 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to sever nonresident Plaintiffs MOTION to dismiss party nonresident Plaintiffs for improper venue filed by Curtis Lee Morrison on behalf of Plaintiffs Mohammad Naser Sadeghi, Mohammad Reza Babaei Mosleh, Hedieh Yoonesi, Mahsa Hamedani, Ali Soltaninejad, Mona Eskandari, Danial Rezaei, Zahra Khoobkar, Parisa Sheikhi Karizaki, Rana Jahani, Kaveh Hooshmandi, Sarasadat Nabavizadeh, Alireza Safarkhani, Sara Gohari, Mohammad Pirhayati, Masoud Rahimi, Saba Bahrami, Mohammadamin Rami. Reply suggestions due by 3/4/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-] 17
Att: 1 Exhibit A DOJ Letter explaining Administrative Processing,
Att: 2 Exhibit B1 U.S. Dept of State Bureau of Consular Affairs, Administrative Processing Information (on December 3, 2017),
Att: 3 Exhibit B2 U.S. Dept of State Bureau of Consular Affairs, Administrative Processing Information (on May 13, 2024),
Att: 4 Exhibit C Excerpt of Transcript, EsmaeilZadeh v Blinken, Case No. 8:23-cv-02118-FWSJDE, oral argument on April 4, 2023,
Att: 5 Exhibit D Excerpt of Transcript, Sanaei v. Blinken, Case No. 4:24-cv-03587-JST, oral argument on October 10, 2024.
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Sever Dismiss Party Tue 02/04 8:33 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to sever nonresident Plaintiffs , MOTION to dismiss party nonresident Plaintiffs for improper venue filed by Joshua Clayton McCroskey on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/18/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(McCroskey, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Alexandra Tate
16 16 notice Notice of MAPADMIN Tue 02/04 1:49 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director.(Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
Monday, February 03, 2025
15 15 order Rule 16 Notice Mon 02/03 2:29 PM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/1/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2025 at 3:15 PM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 2/3/2025 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order of Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 02/03 9:23 AM
Before the Court is a Stipulation of Dismissal of Plaintiff Saba Bahrami. (Doc. #13 .) Upon review, the dismissal is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that all claims of Plaintiff Saba Bahrami against all Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. This dismissal does not affect any remaining Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants. Signed on 2/3/25 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 01, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Sat 02/01 9:09 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Saba Bahrami (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/16 9:47 AM
Before the Court is Defendants Antony J. Blinken and Daniel P. Callahan's (collectively "Defendants") Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. (Doc. #11 .) Upon review, the motion is GRANTED. Defendants may answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before February 4, 2025. Signed on 1/16/2025 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/15 5:00 PM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer re1 Complaint, filed by Joshua Clayton McCroskey on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/29/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (McCroskey, Joshua)
Related: [-] 1
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 8:29 AM
NOTICE of appearance by Joshua Clayton McCroskey on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Joshua Clayton McCroskey added to party Antony J. Blinken(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Clayton McCroskey added to party Daniel P. Callahan(pty:dft))(McCroskey, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/26 8:35 AM
ORDER granting8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Curtis L. Morrison for Mohammad Reza Babaei Mosleh, Saba Bahrami, Mona Eskandari, Sara Gohari, Mahsa Hamedani, Kaveh Hooshmandi, Rana Jahani, Zahra Khoobkar, Sarasadat Nabavizadeh, Mohammad Pirhayati, Masoud Rahimi, Mohammadamin Rami, Danial Rezaei, Mohammad Naser Sadeghi, Alireza Safarkhani, Parisa Sheikhi Karizaki, Ali Soltaninejad and Hedieh Yoonesi allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/24 12:09 PM
Motion to allow Curtis Morrison to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9353798) filed by Abadir Jama Barre on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barre, Abadir)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/24 12:05 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Abadir Jama Barre on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barre, Abadir)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
6 6 respoth Response to order Thu 12/12 5:38 PM
RESPONSE to order re 5 Order to Show Cause,, filed by Abadir Jama Barre on behalf of Plaintiffs Mohammad Naser Sadeghi, Mohammad Reza Babaei Mosleh, Hedieh Yoonesi, Mahsa Hamedani, Ali Soltaninejad, Mona Eskandari, Danial Rezaei, Zahra Khoobkar, Parisa Sheikhi Karizaki, Rana Jahani, Kaveh Hooshmandi, Sarasadat Nabavizadeh, Alireza Safarkhani, Sara Gohari, Mohammad Pirhayati, Masoud Rahimi, Saba Bahrami, Mohammadamin Rami. Related [+] (Barre, Abadir)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, December 06, 2024
5 5 order Order to Show Cause Fri 12/06 2:50 PM
Attorney Barre filed this matter without being admitted to practice in the United States District Court of the Western District of Missouri. On November 11, 2024, the day after filing suit, Attorney Barre was contact by this Court's staff to act by December 3, 2024. Attorney Barre failed to respond. Accordingly, Attorney Barre is ordered to show good cause by December 13, 2024 at 5:00 pm cst why this case should not be dismissed for failing to gain admission to the Western District of Missouri or to seek pro hac vice motion. Signed on 12/6/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 24, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed as to USA Sun 11/24 8:26 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Mohammad Reza Babaei Mosleh, Masoud Rahimi, Kaveh Hooshmandi, Zahra Khoobkar, Rana Jahani, Parisa Sheikhi Karizaki, Mahsa Hamedani, Danial Rezaei, Mohammad Pirhayati, Sarasadat Nabavizadeh, Mohammadamin Rami, Hedieh Yoonesi, Ali Soltaninejad, Mona Eskandari, Saba Bahrami, Alireza Safarkhani, Mohammad Naser Sadeghi, Sara Gohari. Antony J. Blinken served on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025; Daniel P. Callahan served on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025.(Barre, Abadir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of MAPNII Tue 11/19 9:09 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
2 2 order Order Transferring/Reassigning Case Tue 11/19 9:04 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. This case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. no longer assigned to case. This case number shall now read: 2:24-cv-04205-SRB. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Tue 11/19 11:38 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Antony J. Blinken and Daniel P. Callahan. Summonses provided to plaintiffs counsel for service. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/18 6:04 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants filed by Abadir Jama Barre on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9303715. Service due by 2/17/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Barre, Abadir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C1,
Att: 4 Exhibit C2,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet