California Central District Court
Judge:Cynthia Valenzuela
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:24-cv-02466
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Case in other court:County of Riverside, CVRI2405449
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 2:10 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
TG Administration, LLC
Represented By
Patricia Ann Matias
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Alis Marie Moon
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Troon Golf, LLC
Represented By
Patricia Ann Matias
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Alis Marie Moon
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Luis Gutierrez
Represented By
Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Bradley Grombacher LLP
contact info
Marcus Bradley
Bradley Grombacher LLP
contact info
Corey S Smith
Bradley - Grombacher, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
19 19 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 02/28 3:58 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial TBD, filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Gutierrez..(Ramez, Kasra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Proposed Scheduling Order
Friday, February 14, 2025
18 18 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 02/14 10:08 AM
STANDING ORDER For Civil Cases upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
17 17 4 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 11:42 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
16 16 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 01/29 3:07 PM
Judge Cynthia Valenzuela's designated initials are CV. On all documents filed in this case on or after January 29, 2025, substitute the initials CV after the case number in place of CVD. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 01/29 2:57 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. The Court hereby VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for January 31, 2025. No appearances are necessary on this date. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jec)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
14 14 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Tue 01/28 11:13 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#25-025) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Cynthia Valenzuela, this case is transferred from Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes to the calendar of Judge Cynthia Valenzuela for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:24-cv-02466-CVD-DTBx. (ap)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
13 13 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 01/17 1:47 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Gutierrez..(Ramez, Kasra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Proposed Scheduling Order
Thursday, December 05, 2024
12 12 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 12/05 3:02 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2025 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 11/22 12:31 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Tue 11/19 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Troon Golf, LLC, TG Administration, LLC, re Declaration3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Notice of Related Case(s)5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties6 , Corporate Disclosure Statement4 served on 11/18/2024. (Moon, Alis)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 11/18 9:41 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 11/18 9:41 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 11/18 9:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 11/18 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TROON GOLF, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, TG ADMINISTRATION, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company, (Moon, Alis)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Mon 11/18 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant TROON GOLF, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, TG ADMINISTRATION, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company. (Moon, Alis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/18 4:26 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants TROON GOLF, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, TG ADMINISTRATION, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company (Moon, Alis)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Mon 11/18 4:24 PM
DECLARATION of Allison Sheaves re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants TROON GOLF, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, TG ADMINISTRATION, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company. (Moon, Alis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 11/18 4:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants TROON GOLF, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, TG ADMINISTRATION, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company. (Moon, Alis)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 11/18 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside, case number CVRI2405449 Receipt No: ACACDC-38603626 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant TG ADMINISTRATION, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company, TROON GOLF, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Attorney Alis Marie Moon added to party TROON GOLF, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alis Marie Moon added to party TG ADMINISTRATION, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company(pty:dft))(Moon, Alis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 11/18 8:51 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jose Luis Gutierrez in Riverside Superior Court on 10/1/2024, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 11/18 8:54 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Troon Golf, LLC, TG Administration, LLC in Riverside Superior Court on 11/15/2024, attached as Exhibit D. (jtil)
Related: [-]