Montana District Court
Judge:Timothy J Cavan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00167
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 3:08 AM MDT
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-50
Defendant
Montana State University-Billings
Represented By
Adam J. Tunning
Moulton Bellingham, PC
contact info
Nathan Smith
Moulton Bellingham
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Brennan
Represented By
Emily von Jentzen
Kaufman Vidal Hileman Ellingson, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Montana State University-Billings Police Department
Terminated: 01/29/2025
Represented By
Adam J. Tunning
Moulton Bellingham, PC
contact info
Defendant
Montana University System
Terminated: 01/29/2025


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
25 25 order Scheduling Order - SDM Tue 05/06 5:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 5/6/2025. (JDH)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 05/06 3:24 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/6/2025. (BFM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
23 23 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Tue 04/29 2:44 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Montana State University-Billings. (Tunning, Adam)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Tue 04/29 12:51 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Melissa Brennan. (von Jentzen, Emily)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Joint Discovery Plan - SDM Tue 04/29 10:43 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Melissa Brennan. (von Jentzen, Emily)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT Tue 04/29 10:39 AM
STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Melissa Brennan. (von Jentzen, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/23 3:50 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion For Co-Counsel to Attend Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The preliminary pretrial conference set for May 6, 2025, at 11:30 a.m., shall be conducted telephonically. Lead counsel Adam Tunning is excused from the telephonic pretrial conference and co-counsel Nathan Smith may represent MSUB at the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/23/2025. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/22 1:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION For Co-Counsel to Attend Preliminary Pretrial Conference . Adam J. Tunning appearing for Defendant Montana State University-Billings. (Tunning, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order 1 - Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Smith on behalf of Montana State University-Billings (Smith, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
16 16 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT Tue 03/18 3:41 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/29/2025. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/29/2025. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/29/2025. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2025 at 11:30 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/18/2025. (JDH)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Clerk's Notice of Assignment to USMJ - MT Tue 03/18 1:19 PM
Clerk's Notice of Assignment to USMJ. Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1 and no objection having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
14 14 limited Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Thu 03/06 3:13 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
13 13 limited Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Mon 03/03 3:09 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
12 12 notice Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT Tue 02/25 10:30 AM
Service of Notification of Assignment to Magistrate Judge form. Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/11/2025. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/21 11:11 AM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint by Montana State University-Billings Police Department. (Tunning, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/29 12:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe Defendants 1-50, Montana State University-Billings Police Department, filed by Melissa Brennan. (von Jentzen, Emily)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion - MT Wed 01/29 10:22 AM
ORDER granting8 Stipulated Motion. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. On or before January 31, 2025, Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint in accordance with Local Rule 15.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 1/29/2025. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 motion Stipulation Motion - MT Tue 01/28 2:45 PM
Stipulated Motion . Emily von Jentzen appearing for Plaintiff Melissa Brennan. (von Jentzen, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/23 3:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Brennan. Montana University System served on 12/18/2024, answer due 1/8/2025. (von Jentzen, Emily)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/23 3:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons. Served on MSU-B Police Department on 12/17/2024, filed by Melissa Brennan. Montana State University-Billings Police Department answer due date 1/7/2025., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Brennan. Montana State University-Billings Police Department served on 12/17/2024, answer due 1/7/2025. (von Jentzen, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 11/22 9:48 AM
Summons Re-Issued as to Montana State University-Billings Police Department and Montana University System. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
4 4 service Submission of Proposed Summons - MT Thu 11/21 10:58 AM
Submission of Proposed Summons as to Montana University System, re1 Complaint (von Jentzen, Emily)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Submission of Proposed Summons - MT Thu 11/21 10:55 AM
Submission of Proposed Summons as to Montana State University-Billings Police Department, re1 Complaint (von Jentzen, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 11/18 4:28 PM
Summons Issued as to John Doe Defendants 1-50, Montana State University-Billings Police Department, Montana University System. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (JDH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Mon 11/18 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Montana University System, Montana State University-Billings Police Department, John Doe Defendants 1-50, filed by Melissa Brennan. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 11/18 4:34 PM
Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AMTDC-3370784 (JDH)
Related: [-]