New York Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth M Karas
Case #: 7:24-cv-08556
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 25, 2025 11:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Credence Resource Management, LLC
Represented By
Jay I. Brody
Sessions, Israel & Shartle, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jaffe & Asher LLP
Represented By
Gregory E. Galterio
Jaffe & Asher, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Defendant
Selip & Stylianou, LLP
Represented By
Robert Louis Arleo
Robert L. Arleo, Esq., P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Fitzpatrick
184 Sycamore Drive
New Windsor, NY 12553


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
24 24 6 pgs respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 04/24 6:35 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction memorandum in support . . Document filed by Selip & Stylianou, LLP..(Arleo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
23 23 7 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/19 9:56 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SELIP & STYLIANOU, LLP'S MOTION TO DISMISS re:22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction memorandum in support .,21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Christopher Fitzpatrick..(rro)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
22 22 13 pgs motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 03/10 8:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction memorandum in support . Document filed by Selip & Stylianou, LLP..(Arleo, Robert)
Related: [-]
21 21 3 pgs motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 03/10 8:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Selip & Stylianou, LLP..(Arleo, Robert)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Mon 03/10 12:15 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert Louis Arleo to RE-FILE Document 20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for lack of standing. ERROR(S): Supporting documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. First refile Motion, then file and link any supporting documents. (db)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 08, 2025
20 20 3 pgs motion Dismiss Sat 03/08 4:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for lack of standing . Document filed by Selip & Stylianou, LLP..(Arleo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Exhibit Memorandum of Law in support
Friday, February 07, 2025
19 19 3 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 02/10 4:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Midland Credit Management Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Christopher Fitzpatrick..(tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
18 18 5 pgs respoth Response (non-motion) Wed 02/05 3:03 PM
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT SELIP & STYLIANOU'S PRE-MOTION LETTER. Document filed by Christopher Fitzpatrick..(rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
17 17 9 pgs respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 02/04 1:52 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:6 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . . Document filed by Jaffe & Asher LLP..(Berger, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit AOS
16 16 7 pgs respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 02/04 10:56 AM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Credence Resource Management, LLC..(Brody, Jay)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 01/31 9:44 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 15. Mailed to: Christopher Fitzpatrick 184 Sycamore Drive New Windsor, NY 12553. (anc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Thu 01/30 9:16 AM
ORDER with respect to14 Letter Motion for Conference. Selip's Motion to Dismiss is due 3/10/25. Plaintiff's response is due 4/10/25. Selip's reply is due 4/24/25. The Clerk is respectfully directed to mail this document to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 1/29/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/30 9:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 3/10/2025. Responses due by 4/10/2025 Replies due by 4/24/2025. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
14 14 3 pgs motion Conference Wed 01/29 3:37 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference for pupose of obtaining permission to file a motion to dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Robert Arleo dated January 29, 2025. Document filed by Selip & Stylianou, LLP..(Arleo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/28 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Louis Arleo on behalf of Selip & Stylianou, LLP..(Arleo, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
12 12 7 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/28 2:22 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JAFFE & ASHER LLP'S MOTION TO DISMISS re:6 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint .,10 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss. AOS Document filed by Christopher Fitzpatrick. (ar)
Related: [-]
11 11 6 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/28 2:19 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CREDENCE RESOURCE MANAGEMENT, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS re:7 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Christopher Fitzpatrick. (ar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
10 10 1 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 01/21 5:42 PM
FIRST MOTION to Dismiss AOS . Document filed by Jaffe & Asher LLP. Responses due by 2/4/2025.(Galterio, Gregory)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/21 5:09 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Credence Resource Management, LLC..(Brody, Jay)
Related: [-]
8 8 11 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 01/21 5:06 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Credence Resource Management, LLC..(Brody, Jay)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 01/21 5:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Credence Resource Management, LLC..(Brody, Jay)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 01/21 4:56 PM
FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Document filed by Jaffe & Asher LLP. Responses due by 2/4/2025.(Galterio, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Notice of Motion,
Att: 2 Affidavit Atty Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Complaint filed 110824,
Att: 4 Exhibit S&C filed 090924,
Att: 5 Exhibit Answer with CC,
Att: 6 Exhibit Initial Communication 101624,
Att: 7 Exhibit Response to Initial Comm 102424,
Att: 8 11 pgs Supplement Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 9 Supplement Rule 12.1 Notice
Monday, January 06, 2025
5 5 2 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/13 11:37 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jaffe & Asher LLP waiver sent on 11/21/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. Document filed by Christopher Fitzpatrick. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
4 4 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/18 3:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Credence Resource Management, LLC waiver sent on 11/21/2024, answer due 1/21/2025. Document filed by Credence Resource Management, LLC..(Brody, Jay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Christopher Fitzpatrick 184 Sycamore Drive New Windsor, NY 12553.
Related: [-]
misc Mailing Receipt Tue 11/19 1:51 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Mon 11/18 12:19 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Chief Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Mon 11/18 12:19 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information..(tro)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
2 2 1 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 11/18 12:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (tro)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/18 12:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Credence Resource Management, LLC, Jaffe & Asher LLP, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Selip & Stylianou, LLP. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number 809)Document filed by Christopher Fitzpatrick.(tro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit to cmp
utility Case Designation Mon 11/18 12:16 PM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 11/18 12:17 PM
Case Designated ECF. (tro)
Related: [-]