New York Western District Court
Judge:Lawrence J Vilardo
Case #: 1:24-cv-01105
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
324 Properties L.L.C.
Defendant
Richard J. Burghstrom
Plaintiff
Jermaine Fann
430 Main Street Apt. 206
Dunkirk, NY 14048
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Fredonia Police Department
Terminated: 04/16/2025
Defendant
Fredonia Village Court
Terminated: 04/16/2025


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
4 4 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 04/16 2:58 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 45 days of the date of this order, Fann may amend his complaint to state viable claims against Richard Burghstrom, 324 Properties, the Village of Fredonia, any individual Fredonia police officers, and any court employees who allegedly denied him access to the courts. If Fann does not file an amended complaint within 45 days of the date of this order, his claims against all defendants will be dismissed without further order and the Clerk of the Court shall close the case. If the complaint is dismissed because Fann does not amend his complaint, this Court hereby certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore denies leave to appeal as a poor person. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/16/2025. (CGJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
3 3 motion Amend/Correct Tue 12/03 4:16 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption/Party Name by Jermaine Fann.(SG)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 11/18 4:29 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] . Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan.(SG)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 11/18 4:30 PM
Pro Se Packet Mailed to Plaintiff which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and ADR Notification. (SG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 11/18 4:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jermaine Fann.(SG)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/18 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against 324 Properties L.L.C., Richard J. Burgstrom, Fredonia Police Department, Fredonia Village Court, filed by Jermaine Fann.(SG)
Related: [-]