Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:David J Novak
Case #: 3:24-cv-00821
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 5:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Swedish Match North America LLC
Represented By
Johnny Brent Justus
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Carl Lawrence Malm
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Brian Byrne
Cleary Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton Llp (ca-Na)
contact info
Ryan Ashby Shores
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Davis Michael Walsh
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Patrick Dillard
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Defendant
Philip Morris International, Inc.
Represented By
Johnny Brent Justus
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Ryan Ashby Shores
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Davis Michael Walsh
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Patrick Dillard
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Allen Neumark
Represented By
Lee Adair Floyd
contact info
Blake Hunter Yagman
Leeds Brown Law, P.C. (ny-Na)
contact info
Jeremy Francis
Sultzer & Lipari, Pllc (ny-Na)
contact info
Scott Evan Silberfein
Sultzer & Lipari, Pllc (ny-Na)
contact info
Jason Sultzer
Sultzer & Lipari, Pllc (ny-Na)
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Greenwood
Represented By
Lee Adair Floyd
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/07 7:15 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Philip Morris International, Inc., Swedish Match North America LLC. (Shores, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
38 38 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/24 5:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Eric Greenwood, Allen Neumark. (Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
37 37 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 03/03 10:11 PM
Memorandum in Support re36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Philip Morris International, Inc., Swedish Match North America LLC. (Shores, Ryan)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/03 10:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Philip Morris International, Inc., Swedish Match North America LLC.(Shores, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
35 35 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/19 4:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philip Morris International, Inc.. (Dillard, Patrick)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/19 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Davis Michael Walsh on behalf of Philip Morris International, Inc. (Walsh, Davis)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/19 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Brent Justus on behalf of Philip Morris International, Inc. (Justus, Johnny)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/19 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Dillard on behalf of Philip Morris International, Inc. (Dillard, Patrick)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/19 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Ashby Shores on behalf of Philip Morris International, Inc. (Shores, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
30 30 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/14 3:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allen Neumark, Eric Greenwood Philip Morris International, Inc. served on 2/12/2025, answer due 3/5/2025 (Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/11 11:15 AM
ORDER that the Court hereby DENIES AS MOOT Defendant's22 Motion to Dismiss. Any defendant named in the Amended Complaint may file their response by March 3, 2025, as previously ordered by this Court (ECF No.25 ). Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 2/11/2025. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
28 28 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 9:16 AM
Summons Issued as to Philip Morris International, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY : Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Then electronically file the return using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted . Please ensure that the original summons page signed by the clerk is the first document to appear when filing the return of service. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
27 27 misc Proposed Summons Mon 02/10 5:36 PM
Proposed Summons re26 Amended Complaint by Eric Greenwood, Allen Neumark (Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
26 26 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/10 5:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Swedish Match North America LLC, Philip Morris International, Inc., filed by Allen Neumark, Eric Greenwood.(Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Thu 01/23 12:50 PM
ORDER (Granting Motion to Extend Deadlines) that the Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Motion (ECF No.24 ) and provides the following schedule: Plaintiff may have until February 10, 2025, to file its amended complaint, and Defendant may have until March 3, 2025, to file its response to the amended complaint. If Defendant files a motion under Rule 12 in response to the amended complaint, the Plaintiff may have until March 24. 2025. to respond to the motion, and Defendant may then have until April 7, 2025, to file a reply. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/23/2025. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Amend Wed 01/22 5:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint with Governing Deadlines by Allen Neumark.(Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
23 23 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 01/15 4:35 PM
Memorandum in Support re22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Swedish Match North America LLC. (Shores, Ryan)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 01/15 4:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Swedish Match North America LLC.(Shores, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/14 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Davis Michael Walsh on behalf of Swedish Match North America LLC (Walsh, Davis)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 01/10 12:00 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Scott Evan Silberfein to appear Pro hac vice for Allen Neumark. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/10/2025. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 01/10 11:58 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Blake Hunter Yagman to appear Pro hac vice for Allen Neumark. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/10/2025. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/10 10:04 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Evan Silberfein and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9938883. by Allen Neumark. (Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/10 9:34 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Blake Hunter Yagman and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9938705. by Allen Neumark. (Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 01/08 3:52 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Brian Byrne to appear Pro hac vice for Swedish Match North America LLC. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/8/2025. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 01/08 3:50 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Carl Lawrence Malm to appear Pro hac vice for Swedish Match North America LLC. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/8/2025. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/08 11:12 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Byrne and Certification of Local Counsel Ryan Shores Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9935741. by Swedish Match North America LLC. (Shores, Ryan)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/08 11:06 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Carl Lawrence Malm and Certification of Local Counsel Ryan Shores Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9935697. by Swedish Match North America LLC. (Shores, Ryan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Ashby Shores on behalf of Swedish Match North America LLC (Shores, Ryan)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Brent Justus on behalf of Swedish Match North America LLC (Justus, Johnny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Thu 12/12 11:41 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Jeremy Francis to appear Pro hac vice for Allen Neumark. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 12/12/2024. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Thu 12/12 11:40 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Jason Sultzer to appeal Pro hac vice for Allen Neumark. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 12/12/2024. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/11 3:38 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason Sultzer and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9896421. by Allen Neumark. (Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/11 3:33 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy Francis and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9896370. by Allen Neumark. (Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 12/04 3:29 PM
ORDER that the Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines. (ECF No.4 .) As a result, Defendant may file their response to Plaintiff's complaint no later than January 15, 2025. Should Defendant file a motion to dismiss, Plaintiff may respond to the motion by February 14, 2025, and Defendant may file a reply by February 26, 2025. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 12/4/2024. (adun, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/04 12:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Swedish Match North America LLC. (Dillard, Patrick)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Wed 12/04 12:30 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines Related to Defendant's Response to Complaint by Swedish Match North America LLC.(Dillard, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 11/19 11:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Swedish Match North America LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY : Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Then electronically file the return using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted . Please ensure that the original summons page signed by the clerk is the first document to appear when filing the return of service. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Tue 11/19 11:27 AM
Notice of Correction: Filing attorney notified civil case cover sheet and proposed summons were uploaded as fillable forms. All documents need to be uploaded as a standard PDF. Clerk has corrected and replaced documents. No further action is required. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 11/18 7:35 PM
Proposed Summons by Allen Neumark (Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/18 7:18 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9854668.), filed by Allen Neumark.(Floyd, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 11/19 11:23 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]