Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:24-cv-02063
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jan 03, 2025 4:07 AM EST
Defendant
Filters Fast LLC
Represented By
Joseph Andrew Smith
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew James Mcgonigle
Represented By
William Peter Robinson, III
William Robinson, Esq
contact info
Anthony Ilo Paronich
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 03/28 1:35 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Abigail Louise Howd for Filters Fast LLC. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/28/2025. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
14 14 6 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Thu 03/20 9:40 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Proposed Joint Discovery Plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) (Joint Discovery Plan) (Dkt. 12) and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Dkt. 11) the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by July 11, 2025. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved, as amended herein, and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. 3. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures, if not already completed, shall be completed by March 20, 2025. 4. The Court adopts the deadline for amendment of pleadings proposed in section 8 of the Joint Discovery Plan. The parties have up to and including March 28, 2025 to amend the pleadings in accordance with Rule 15. 5. The Court adopts the timeline for class certification proposed in section 8 of the Joint Discovery Plan. Any class certification motion shall be filed on or before July 18, 2025. Defendants opposition to class certification shall be filed on or before August 15, 2025. Plaintiffs reply in support of class certification shall be filed on or before August 29, 2025. The District Judge will schedule the final pretrial conference and deadlines for trial-related filings at a later date. 6. Expert disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) shall be made in accordance with section 8 of the Joint Discovery Plan. Specifically, Plaintiffs expert disclosures are due by May 26, 2025. Defendants expert disclosures are due by June 27, 2025. To the extent the parties wish to modify expert deadlines, they must seek leave of court. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 3/19/25. (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/18 9:24 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Abigail Louise Howd and Certification of Local Counsel Joseph A. Smith Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-10067089. by Filters Fast LLC. (Smith, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26 f Planning Meeting Wed 03/12 4:16 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Filters Fast LLC. (Smith, Joseph)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 03/12 11:38 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 3/18/2025 at 03:00 PM in Alexandria Telephonically before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/25 8:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2025 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. Discovery due by 7/11/2025. Motions for Summary Judgment will be due by Friday, July 25, 2025. A final pretrial conference will be set after any motions for summary judgment are resolved. If no party files a motion for summary judgment, then the parties must file a notice or motion with the Court on or before Friday, August 1, 2025, informing the Court that no motion for summary judgment has been filed and that a final pretrial conference should be set. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 2/25/2025.(tarm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice,
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thursday, January 16, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/16 6:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Filters Fast LLC.(Smith, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/17 9:50 AM
ORDERED that Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendant will have until January 16, 2025 to move, respond, answer, or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint re8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 12/16/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 12/16 10:56 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Filters Fast LLC.(Smith, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 29, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Fri 11/29 4:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Filters Fast LLC on 11/26/2024, filed by Andrew James Mcgonigle. (Robinson, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Thu 11/21 12:43 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Anthony Ilo Paronich for Andrew James Mcgonigle. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/21/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 11/20 3:34 PM
Summons Issued as to FILTERS FAST LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Cwel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/19 6:34 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Paronich and Certification of Local Counsel William P. Robinson III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9857213. by ANDREW JAMES MCGONIGLE. (Robinson, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/19 1:32 AM
Civil Cover Sheet re1 Complaint by ANDREW JAMES MCGONIGLE. (Robinson, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 11/19 1:25 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by ANDREW JAMES MCGONIGLE (Robinson, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 12:57 AM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9854745.), filed by ANDREW JAMES MCGONIGLE.(Robinson, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 11/20 3:37 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Cwel)
Related: [-]